DDB Technologies, L.L.C. v. Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DDB Technologies, L.L.C.
Defendant: CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network and CSTV Online, Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC and Stat Crew Software, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01014
Filed: November 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (klw)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing action without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #87 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING #86 Motion to Vacate Orders and Opinions rendered in DDB Technologies, LLC v. CSTV Networks and CSTV Online, Inc., although such Orders and Opinions remain in effect for any other action in which they were rendered. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss by DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Orders and Opinions by DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #82 Motion to Sever Patent Infringment Actions. Civil actions A-11-cv-929 and A-11-cv-1012 are hereby SEVERED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file the dismissal papers relating to the StatCrew claims in Civil Action A-1l-CV-1012, and relating to the CSTV claims in Civil Action A-l1-CV-1014, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., re #82 MOTION to Sever filed by Plaintiff DDB Technologies, L.L.C. (Ruiz, James)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, re #82 MOTION to Sever filed by Plaintiff DDB Technologies, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Preston, Hilary)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Sever by DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruiz, James)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C., re #77 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C. (Smith, John)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, re #77 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Stout, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Preston, Hilary)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. (Preston, Hilary)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 28, 2013, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephone Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 8/5/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2013, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Amend Complaint by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 (Amended Complaint), #3 Exhibit 1-A, #4 Exhibit 1-B, #5 Exhibit 1-C, #6 Exhibit 1-D, #7 Exhibit 1-E, #8 Exhibit 1-F, #9 Exhibit 1-G, #10 Exhibit 1-H, #11 Exhibit 1-I, #12 Exhibit 2, #13 Exhibit 3, #14 Exhibit 4, #15 Exhibit 5, #16 Exhibit 6, #17 Exhibit 7, #18 Exhibit 8, #19 Exhibit 9)(Shea, Rory)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING DDB's #67 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: In Chambers Hearing held on 6/28/2013 re: DDB's #67 Motion to Compel. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(klw)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER setting Telephonic Hearing for 6/28/2013 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, re #67 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Fox Sports and Request for a Telephonic Hearing filed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Stout, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Preston, Hilary)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen Charles Stout for Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC,Stephen Charles Stout for Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on May 30, 2013, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephone Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/12/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2013, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David B. Weaver on behalf of Applicant, Stephen Charles Stout ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5622442) by on behalf of Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ATTACHMENT (Proposed Order) to #67 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Fox Sports and Request for a Telephonic Hearing by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Smith, John)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John Dan Smith: re #67 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Fox Sports and Request for a Telephonic Hearing. Proposed Orders are Required when a Motion (or Amended Motion) is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please, file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "ATTACHMENT" event from the menu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Motion. In the Docket Text, type "(Proposed Order)". (klw)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Fox Sports and Request for a Telephonic Hearing by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Smith, John)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING #55 MOTION to Supplement Scheduling Order and Request for Telephonic Hearing. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Proposed Scheduling Order submitted jointly by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc., DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C., Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Stat Crew Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Smith, John)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc., DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C., Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Stat Crew Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order)(Smith, John)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Telephone Conference held on 5/30/2013 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.) (kkc)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc., Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Stat Crew Software, Inc., re #55 MOTION to supplement Scheduling Order filed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C. (Albright, Alan)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Stat Crew Software, Inc., re #56 MOTION for Protective Order filed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C. (Albright, Alan)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 5/30/2013 03:30 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on May 17, 2013, Proceedings Transcribed: Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/18/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2013, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Protective Order by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Smith, John)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to supplement Scheduling Order by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Smith, John)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING #53 Motion for Alison J. Baldwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plainitffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Dan Smith for Alison J. Baldwin ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5544037) by on behalf of DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, John)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Scheduling Conference held on 5/17/2013. Deadlines and settings announced. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(klw)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION; DENYING #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness; Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2013 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on August 17, 2012, Proceedings Transcribed: Markman Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-916-5143. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 9/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2012. (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Markman Hearing held on 8/17/2012 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(jk, )
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 BRIEF regarding #42 Brief,, by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C. Responsive Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CC, #2 Exhibit DD, #3 Unreported Case Law)(Smith, John)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 BRIEF regarding #43 Brief,, by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc., Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC Responsive Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Kevin)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc., Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Stat Crew Software, Inc., re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by Defendant CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, Consol Defendant Stat Crew Software, Inc., Consol Defendant Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Defendant CSTV Online, Inc. (Preston, Hilary)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C., re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by Defendant CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, Consol Defendant Stat Crew Software, Inc., Consol Defendant Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Defendant CSTV Online, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(Smith, John)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Correction of Clerical Error in DDB's Opening Markman Brief by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C. re #43 Brief,, (Attachments: #1 Replacement Page, #2 Certificate of Service)(Shea, Rory)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 BRIEF by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C. Opening Markman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB1, #29 Exhibit BB2)(Smith, John)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 BRIEF by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc., Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Stat Crew Software, Inc. DEFENDANTS' OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G to Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit H-Q to Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief, #3 Exhibit R-DD to Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief, #4 Exhibit EE-FF to Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief, #5 Exhibit GG-JJ to Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief)(Weaver, David)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #39 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to #38 Motion for Summary Judgment under SEAL. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ATTACHMENT PROPOSED ORDER to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc., Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Stat Crew Software, Inc.. (Weaver, David)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits L, N-S to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit L to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit N to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #4 Sealed Document Exhibit O to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #5 Sealed Document Exhibit P to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #6 Sealed Document Exhibit Q to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #7 Sealed Document Exhibit R to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #8 Sealed Document Exhibit S to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness) (Weaver, David)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc., Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Stat Crew Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #2 Exhibit B to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #3 Exhibit C to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #4 Exhibit D to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #5 Exhibit E to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #6 Exhibit F to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #7 Exhibit G to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #8 Exhibit H to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #9 Exhibit I to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #10 Exhibit J to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #11 Exhibit K to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #12 Exhibit M to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #13 Exhibit T to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #14 Exhibit U to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness)(Weaver, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2012: #15 SEALED Exhibits L, N-S) (klw, ).
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING #36 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc, )
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Sealed Document Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit A to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #4 Sealed Document Exhibit B to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #5 Sealed Document Exhibit C to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #6 Sealed Document Exhibit D to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #7 Sealed Document Exhibit E to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #8 Sealed Document Exhibit F to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #9 Sealed Document Exhibit G to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #10 Sealed Document Exhibit H to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #11 Sealed Document Exhibit I to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #12 Sealed Document Exhibit J to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #13 Sealed Document Exhibit K to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #14 Sealed Document Exhibit L to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #15 Sealed Document Exhibit M to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #16 Sealed Document Exhibit N to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #17 Sealed Document Exhibit O to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #18 Sealed Document Exhibit P to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #19 Sealed Document Exhibit Q to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #20 Sealed Document Exhibit R to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #21 Sealed Document Exhibit S to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #22 Sealed Document Exhibit T to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness, #23 Sealed Document Exhibit U to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness) (Weaver, David)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines and a Claim Construction and Summary Judgment Hearing for 8/17/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STATUS REPORT Joint Claim Construction Statement by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Smith, John)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C..(Smith, John)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C..(Smith, John)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on May 23, 2012, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephone Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-916-5143. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2012. (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Telephone Conference held on 5/23/2012. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(klw, )
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stat Crew Software, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against DDB Technologies, L.L.C. by Stat Crew Software, Inc..(Smith, Kevin)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against DDB Technologies, L.L.C. by CSTV Online, Inc., CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network.(Smith, Kevin)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Proposed Scheduling Order Submitted Jointly by the Parties by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., DDB Technologies, L.L.C., Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC, Stat Crew Software, Inc., CBS Sports Network and CS TV Online, Inc. (Smith, John) Modified on 5/21/2012 to add filers (klw, ).
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on May 4, 2012, Proceedings Transcribed: Pretrial Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-916-5143. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 6/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2012. (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Civil Actions A-11-cv-929 and A-11-cv-1012 are consolidated with and into this civil action. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Kevin Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc, )
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Evette Pennypacker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc, )
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Claude Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc, )
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Kevin Smith ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4535168) by on behalf of CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc.. (Albright, Alan)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Evette Pennypacker ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4535146) by on behalf of CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc.. (Albright, Alan)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan D Albright for Claude Stern ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4535125) by on behalf of CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc.. (Albright, Alan)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE to the Court re Deadline to Answer by CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc. (Albright, Alan)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. CSTV Online, Inc. served on 3/27/2012, answer due 4/17/2012. (Ruiz, James)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network served on 3/27/2012, answer due 4/17/2012. (Ruiz, James)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network, CSTV Online, Inc. (klw, )
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network and CSTV Online, Inc.) (Ruiz, James)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Michael D. Gannon to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Paul A. Kafadar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Rory P. Shea to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for John D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Dan Smith ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4145352) by on behalf of DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, John)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Dan Smith for Rory P. Shea ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4145351) by on behalf of DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, John)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Dan Smith for Paul A. Kafadar ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4145350) by on behalf of DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, John)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Dan Smith for Michael D. Gannon ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4145349) by on behalf of DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, John)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (os)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letters to John Dan Smith, Michael Gannon, Paul Kafadar & Rory Shea re: non-admitted status. (os)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0542-4131855). No Summons requested at this time, filed by DDB Technologies, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Part 1, #3 Exhibit A - Part 2, #4 Exhibit B - Part 1, #5 Exhibit B - Part 2, #6 Exhibit C - Part 1, #7 Exhibit C - Part 2, #8 Exhibit D - Part 1, #9 Exhibit D - Part 2, #10 Exhibit E)(Ruiz, James)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (os)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DDB Technologies, L.L.C., contained in the complaint. (os)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DDB Technologies, L.L.C. v. Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DDB Technologies, L.L.C.
Represented By: Rory P. Shea
Represented By: Alison J. Baldwin
Represented By: James G. Ruiz
Represented By: John Dan Smith, III
Represented By: Leif R. Sigmond, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Gannon
Represented By: Paul A. Kafadar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSTV Networks, Inc. d/b/a CBS Sports Network
Represented By: Alan D Albright
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Kevin Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSTV Online, Inc.
Represented By: Alan D Albright
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Kevin Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fox Sports Interactive Media, LLC
Represented By: David B. Weaver
Represented By: Hilary Lovett Preston
Represented By: Jennifer Librach Nall
Represented By: Stephen Charles Stout
Represented By: Syed K. Fareed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Stat Crew Software, Inc.
Represented By: Alan D Albright
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Kevin Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?