The State of Texas et al v. Penguin Group (USA) Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, The State of Alaska, The State of Arizona, The State of Colorado, The State of Connecticut, The State of Illinois, The State of Iowa, The State of Maryland, The State of Missouri, The State of Ohio, The State of South Dakota, The State of Tennessee, The State of Texas, The State of Vermont and The State of West Virginia
Defendant: Apple Inc., Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, Macmillian Holdings, LLC, Penguin Group (USA) Inc., Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00324
Filed: April 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2012 Filing 65 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Southern District of New York as case number 1:12-cv-3394. (kkc, )
April 26, 2012 Filing 64 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) - transferring case to the Southern District of New York, MDL No. 2293. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kkc, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion for Mitchelle L. Gentile to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Ohio. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion for Anne E. Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Missouri. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 32 Motion for John R. Tennis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Maryland. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion for Schonette Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Maryland. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 30 Motion for Michael E. Cole to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Connecticut. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 29 Motion Gary M. Becker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Connecticut. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 28 Motion for Ryan G. Kriger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Vermont. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion for Victor J. Domen, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The State of Tennessee. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 26 Motion for Jeffrey P. Hallem to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of South Dakota. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion for Jose M. Tous Cardona to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion for Jose G. Diaz-Tejera to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Commmonwealth of Puerto Rico. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 23 Motion for James A. Donahue, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion for Jennifer J. Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 36 Motion for W. Joseph Nielsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Connecticut. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 35 Motion for Robert W. Pratt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The State of Illinois. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Nancy M. Bonnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The State of Arizona. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion for Susan V. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The State of Arizona. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion for Douglas L. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of West Virginia. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion for Clyde E. Sniffen, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The State of Alaska. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Devin Laiboto Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Colorado. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion for Layne M. Lindebak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Iowa. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion for Chadwick O. Booker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Illinois. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion for Ellen S. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Maryland. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion for Brianna L. Lennon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The State of Missouri. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion for Jessica I. Oldham to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The State of Ohio. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Doreen C. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Ohio. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion for Edward J. Olszweskito Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the State of Ohio. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Joseph Nielsen by on behalf of The State of Connecticut. (klw, )
April 24, 2012 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert W. Pratt by on behalf of The State of Illinois. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas L. Davis by on behalf of The State of West Virginia. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne E. Schneider by on behalf of The State of Missouri. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John R. Tennis by on behalf of The State of Maryland. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Schonette Walker by on behalf of The State of Maryland. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Cole by on behalf of The State of Connecticut. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gary M. Becker by on behalf of The State of Connecticut. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Kriger by on behalf of The State of Vermont. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Victor J. Domen, Jr by on behalf of The State of Tennessee. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey P. Hallem by on behalf of The State of South Dakota. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jose M. Tous Cardona by on behalf of The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jose G. Diaz-Tejera by on behalf of The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James A. Donahue by on behalf of The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer J. Kirk by on behalf of The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward J. Olszewski by on behalf of The State of Ohio. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mitchell L. Gentile by on behalf of The State of Ohio. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Doreen C. Johnson by on behalf of The State of Ohio. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica I. Oldham by on behalf of The State of Ohio. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brianna Lennon by on behalf of The State of Missouri. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ellen S. Cooper by on behalf of The State of Maryland. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chadwick O. Brooker by on behalf of The State of Illinois. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Layne M. Lindebak by on behalf of The State of Iowa. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Devin M. Laiho by on behalf of The State of Colorado. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan V. Myers by on behalf of The State of Arizona. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clyde E. Sniffen, Jr by on behalf of The State of Alaska. (klw, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy M. Bonnell by on behalf of The State of Arizona. (klw, )
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted First Amended Complaint under SEAL. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 8 Motion for leave to File Unredacted Amended Complaint under SEAL. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order) (klw, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., Penguin Group (USA) Inc., Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC amending 1 Complaint, filed by The State of Vermont, The State of Tennessee, The State of Missouri, The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, The State of Iowa, The State of Texas, The State of Colorado, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, The State of Illinois, The State of Alaska, The State of Connecticut, The State of Ohio, The State of West Virginia, The State of Arizona, The State of Maryland, The State of South Dakota.(klw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2012: # 2 SEALED Unredacted Complaint) (klw, ).
April 13, 2012 Filing 6 Letters to all plaintiff counsel (except for Texas) re: non-admitted status. (klw, )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted version of 1 Complaint under SEAL. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion for Gabriel Ross Gervey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The State of Texas. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw, )
April 11, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabriel R. Gervey by on behalf of The State of Texas. Fee Waived. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(klw, )
April 11, 2012 Filing 2 Motion for leave to File Unredacted Complainted Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order) (klw, )
April 11, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Civil Penalties and as Parens Patriae on behalf of Consumers ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 100013497), filed by The State of Vermont, The State of Tennessee, The State of Missouri, The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, The State of Iowa, The State of Texas, The State of Colorado, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, The State of Illinois, The State of Alaska, The State of Connecticut, The State of Ohio, The State of West Virginia, The State of Arizona, The State of Maryland, The State of South Dakota. (Attachments: # 1 /List of Attorneys/Receipt)(klw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2012: # 2 SEALED Unredacted Version of Complaint) (klw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Texas et al v. Penguin Group (USA) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macmillian Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Group (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: James A. Donahue
Represented By: Jennifer J. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jose M. Tous Cardona
Represented By: Jose G. Diaz-Tejera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Alaska
Represented By: Clyde E. Sniffen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Arizona
Represented By: Nancy M. Bonnell
Represented By: Susan V. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Colorado
Represented By: Devin M. Laiho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Connecticut
Represented By: Gary M. Becker
Represented By: Michael E. Cole
Represented By: W. Joseph Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Illinois
Represented By: Chadwick O. Brooker
Represented By: Robert W. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Iowa
Represented By: Layne M. Lindebak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Maryland
Represented By: Ellen S. Cooper
Represented By: John R. Tennis
Represented By: Schonette Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Missouri
Represented By: Brianna Lennon
Represented By: Anne E. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Ohio
Represented By: Mitchell L. Gentile
Represented By: Doreen C. Johnson
Represented By: Jessica I. Oldham
Represented By: Edward J. Olszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of South Dakota
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Hallem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Tennessee
Represented By: Victor J. Domen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Texas
Represented By: David M. Ashton
Represented By: Gabriel R. Gervey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Vermont
Represented By: Ryan Kriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of West Virginia
Represented By: Douglas L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?