Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services et al v. Abbott et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc. and Whole Woman's Health
Defendant: Attorney General Gregory Abbott, Devon Anderson, David Escamilla, Jaime Esparza, Rene Guerra, David Lakey, M.D., James E. Nichols, Matthew Powell, Susan D. Reed, Abelino Reyna, Mari Robinson, Joe Shannon, Jr. and Craig Watkins
Amicus: Texas Eagle Forum
Movant: Mitchell Williams
Case Number: 1:2013cv00862
Filed: September 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING 104 Motion for Extension of Time to File for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
November 18, 2013 Transmitted Record on Appeal via e-mail to the Office of the Attorney General re Notice of Appeal. (dm)
November 7, 2013 Filing 104 MOTION for Extension of Time to File on Attorneys Fees and Costs by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order On Extension of Time)(von Kreisler, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DISMISSING 102 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 31, 2013 Filing 102 MOTION for Reconsideration by Mitchell Williams. (kkc)
October 29, 2013 Notice of Certification of Supplemental Record on Appeal to the USCA, re: 98 Notice of Appeal. (kkc)
October 29, 2013 Transmitted Trial Exhibits (dkt 94, 95) to US Court of Appeals, re: 98 Notice of Appeal. Exhibits picked up by 5th Circuit Staff. (kkc) Modified docket text on 10/29/2013 (kkc).
October 29, 2013 Filing 101 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on October 23, 2013, Proceedings Transcribed: Bench Trial Volume 3 of 3. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/19/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2014, Appeal Record due by 11/13/2013, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
October 29, 2013 Filing 100 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on October 22, 2013, Proceedings Transcribed: Bench Trial Volume 2 of 3. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/19/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2014, Appeal Record due by 11/13/2013, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
October 29, 2013 Filing 99 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on October 21, 2013, Proceedings Transcribed: Bench Trial Volume 1 of 3. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 11/19/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2014, Appeal Record due by 11/13/2013, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
October 29, 2013 Notice of Certification of Record on Appeal to the USCA, re: 98 Notice of Appeal. (kkc)
October 28, 2013 NOTICE OF APPEAL following 98 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. Filing fee $455, receipt number 0542-5969954. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (kkc)
October 28, 2013 Filing 98 Appeal of Final Judgment 97 by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. ( Filing fee $ 455 receipt number 0542-5969954) (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 28, 2013 Filing 97 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OPINION INCORPORATING FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 23, 2013 Filing 95 Exhibit List from Bench Trial by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (kkc)
October 23, 2013 Filing 94 Amended Exhibit List from Bench Trial by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (kkc)
October 23, 2013 Filing 93 Witness List from Bench Trial by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (kkc)
October 23, 2013 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Bench Trial concluded on 10/23/2013 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.) (kkc)
October 22, 2013 Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Bench Trial held on 10/22/2013. Bench Trial Closing Argument set for 10/23/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.) (kkc)
October 22, 2013 Filing 90 TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 807 by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 22, 2013 Filing 89 Evidentiary Objections to Plaintiff's Declarations and Rebuttal Declarations by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (kkc)
October 22, 2013 Filing 88 Miscellaneous Objection to 70 Exhibit List by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (George, R.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Bench Trial begun on 10/21/2013. Bench Trial returning on 10/22/2013 at 9:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.) (kkc)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING 85 Motion Authorizing Disclosure and Use at Trial of Abortion Induction and Complication Reports of Facility Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 21, 2013 Filing 85 MOTION for Court Order Authorizing the Disclosure and Use of Abortion Induction and Complication Reports Submitted by Facility Plaintiffs by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (dm)
October 21, 2013 Filing 84 Witness List by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 20, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 20, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 18, 2013 Filing 81 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson.(Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 18, 2013 Filing 80 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health.. (von Kreisler, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2013 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health 73 Proposed Findings of Fact,, (George, R.)
October 18, 2013 Filing 78 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Facts and Admissibility of Evidence by Gregory Abbott, Devon Anderson, Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, David Escamilla, Jaime Esparza, Rene Guerra, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, David Lakey, M.D., James E. Nichols, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Matthew Powell, Susan D. Reed, Abelino Reyna, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Mari Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Joe Shannon, Jr., Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Craig Watkins, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (von Kreisler, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2013 Filing 77 *** FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF DOCUMENT FILED. DOCUMENT RE-FILED AS DOCKET ENTRY NO. 78 ***STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Facts and Admissibility of Evidence by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (von Kreisler, Elizabeth) Modified docket text on 10/18/2013 (kkc).
October 18, 2013 Filing 76 APPENDIX to 74 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A to Appendix, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B to Appendix, # 3 Exhibit Ex C to Appendix, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D to Appendix, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E part 1 to Appeddix, # 6 Exhibit Ex. E part 2 to Appendix, # 7 Exhibit Ex. E part 3 to Appendix, # 8 Exhibit Ex. E part 4 to Appendix, # 9 Exhibit Ex. F to Appendix)(George, R.) Modified docket text on 10/18/2013 (kkc).
October 18, 2013 Filing 75 *** FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE FILING OF DOCKET ENTRY NO. 74 *** REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health, re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Plaintiff Routh Street Women's Clinic, Plaintiff Killeen Women's Health Center, Plaintiff Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Plaintiff Austin Women's Health Center, Plaintiff Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Plaintiff Pamela J. Richter, Plaintiff Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Plaintiff West Side Clinic, Inc., Plaintiff Lamar Robinson, Plaintiff Whole Woman's Health, Plaintiff Alan Braid, Plaintiff Houston Women's Clinic, Plaintiff Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center (George, R.) Modified on 10/18/2013 (kkc).
October 18, 2013 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health, re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Plaintiff Routh Street Women's Clinic, Plaintiff Killeen Women's Health Center, Plaintiff Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Plaintiff Austin Women's Health Center, Plaintiff Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Plaintiff Pamela J. Richter, Plaintiff Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Plaintiff West Side Clinic, Inc., Plaintiff Lamar Robinson, Plaintiff Whole Woman's Health, Plaintiff Alan Braid, Plaintiff Houston Women's Clinic, Plaintiff Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center (George, R.)
October 18, 2013 Filing 73 Proposed Findings of Fact by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (von Kreisler, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2013 Filing 72 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health.. (von Kreisler, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2013 Filing 71 Proposed Findings of Fact by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 18, 2013 Filing 70 Exhibit List by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 18, 2013 Filing 69 Witness List by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 18, 2013 Filing 68 Witness List by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (George, R.)
October 17, 2013 Filing 67 APPENDIX to 66 Advisory to the Court by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email from Janet Crepps (Oct. 10, 2013), # 2 Exhibit Email from Janet Crepps (Oct. 15, 2013), # 3 Exhibit Email from Arthur C. D'Andrea (Oct. 15, 2013))(Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 17, 2013 Filing 66 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 64 Motion to Dismiss Local Prosecutor Defendants. Terminated parties: Jaime Esparza (District Attorney for El Paso County, each in their official capacities, as well as their employees, agents, and successors), Rene Guerra (Criminal District Attorney for Hidalgo County), James E. Nichols (County Attorney for Bell County), Matthew Powell (Director of the Lubbock County Criminal District Attorney's Office), Susan D. Reed (Criminal District Attorney for Bexar County), Abelino Reyna (Criminal District Attorney for Mclennan County), Joe Shannon, Jr. (Criminal District Attorney for Tarrant County), Craig Watkins (Criminal District Attorney for Dallas County), Devon Anderson (District Attorney for Harris County) and David Escamilla (County Attorney for Travis County). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 17, 2013 Filing 64 Joint MOTION to Dismiss JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS THE LOCAL PROSECUTOR DEFENDANTS by Devon Anderson, David Escamilla, Jaime Esparza, Rene Guerra, James E. Nichols, Matthew Powell, Susan D. Reed, Abelino Reyna, Joe Shannon, Jr., Craig Watkins. (Casas, Elaine)
October 16, 2013 Filing 63 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Texas Eagle Forum, re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiffs. (kkc)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 58 Motion for Leave to File a Memorandum of Law as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants Urging Denial of Interim Relief. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 15, 2013 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Telephone Conference in Chambers held on 10/15/2013 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.) (kkc)
October 15, 2013 Filing 60 APPENDIX to 59 Response to Motion,,, by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Dr. Mikeal Love, # 2 Affidavit Dr. Donna Harrison, # 3 Affidavit Dr. James Anderson, # 4 Affidavit Dr. John Thorp, # 5 Affidavit Abby Johnson, # 6 Affidavit Dr. Peter Uhlenberg, # 7 Affidavit Dr. Jacqueline Harvey, # 8 Affidavit Marc Connelly)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 15, 2013 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson, re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Plaintiff Routh Street Women's Clinic, Plaintiff Killeen Women's Health Center, Plaintiff Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Plaintiff Austin Women's Health Center, Plaintiff Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Plaintiff Pamela J. Richter, Plaintiff Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Plaintiff West Side Clinic, Inc., Plaintiff Lamar Robinson, Plaintiff Whole Woman's Health, Plaintiff Alan Braid, Plaintiff Houston Women's Clinic, Plaintiff Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 11, 2013 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Lawrence J. Joseph. by Texas Eagle Forum. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joseph, Lawrence)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 50 Motion for Andrew S. Oldham to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendants Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, Mari Robinson. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that the parties to this cause shall file with the court their witness lists, exhibit lists, agreed stipulated facts, and proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law no later than 12:00 pm, Friday, October 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 9, 2013 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. Craig Watkins served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 9, 2013 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. Joe Shannon, Jr. served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 9, 2013 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Routh Street Women's Clinic, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. Rene Guerra served on 9/30/2013, answer due 10/21/2013. (George, R.) Modified on 10/10/2013 to add filers (kkc).
October 9, 2013 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. Jaime Esparza served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.) Modified on 10/10/2013 to add filers (kkc).
October 9, 2013 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. Devon Anderson served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 9, 2013 Filing 50 MOTION for Andrew S. Oldham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson. (kkc)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 46 Motion for Lawrence J. Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 42 Motion for Rebecca L. Robertson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER (Trial on the Merits to the Bench set for 10/21/2013 at 9:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc) Modified docket text on 10/8/2013 (kkc).
October 8, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen Tripp for Lawrence J. Joseph ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5914616) by on behalf of Texas Eagle Forum. (Tripp, Karen)
October 8, 2013 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. Abelino Reyna served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. Susan D. Reed served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. Matthew Powell served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. James George, Jr for Rebecca L. Robertson ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5914059) by on behalf of Houston Women's Clinic, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Grating Motion PHV)(George, R.) Modified on 10/8/2013 to remove filers (kkc).
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING 39 Motion for Mitchell Williams to Intervene; DISMISSING 40 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion for Renee Paradis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion for Brigitte Amiri to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 4, 2013 Filing 40 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mitchell Williams. (kkc)
October 4, 2013 Filing 39 MOTION to Intervene by Mitchell Williams. (kkc)
October 4, 2013 Filing 36 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on October 1, 2013, Proceedings Transcribed: Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/25/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2014, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion for Rico Reyes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 3, 2013 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. James George, Jr for Rico Reyes ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5904230) by on behalf of Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Mtn Admission PHV)(George, R.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. James E. Nichols served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. David Lakey, M.D. served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. Mari Robinson served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. David Escamilla served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. Gregory Abbott served on 9/27/2013, answer due 10/18/2013. (George, R.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Beth Klusmann on behalf of Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson (Klusmann, Beth)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Jennifer Sokoler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion for Esha Bhandari to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 1, 2013 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. James George, Jr ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5897712) by on behalf of Houston Women's Clinic, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(George, R.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. James George, Jr ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5897694) by on behalf of Houston Women's Clinic, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(George, R.)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion for Janet Crepps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion for Helene T. Krasnoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Alice Clapman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 1, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip A. Lionberger on behalf of Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson (Lionberger, Philip)
October 1, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. James George, Jr ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5896939) by on behalf of Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Killeen Women's Health Center, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(George, R.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. James George, Jr ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5896880) by on behalf of Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Killeen Women's Health Center, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(George, R.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Murphy on behalf of Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson (Murphy, Michael)
October 1, 2013 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. James George, Jr ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5896254) by on behalf of Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Killeen Women's Health Center, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(George, R.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Scheduling Conference held on 10/1/2013. Response brief to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 10/15/2013 at noon; reply due 10/18/2013 at noon; Trial on the Merits set for 10/21/2013 at 9:00 am. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.) (kkc)
October 1, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. James George, Jr ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5896155) by on behalf of Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(George, R.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by R. James George, Jr ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-5896125) by on behalf of Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(George, R.)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (kkc)
October 1, 2013 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson Corrected Certificate of Service 6 Notice of Appearance (Mitchell, Jonathan)
October 1, 2013 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 6 Notice of Appearance (dm)
October 1, 2013 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix and Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F thru F-2, # 9 Proposed Order)(George, R.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(George, R.)
September 30, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arthur C. D'Andrea on behalf of Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson (D'Andrea, Arthur)
September 30, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Gregory Abbott, David Lakey, M.D., Mari Robinson (Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 27, 2013 Filing 5 Letter to Rico Reyes, Helene T. Krasnoff, Alice Clapman, Janet Crepps, Esha Bhandari, Jennifer Sokoler, Brigitte Amiri, Renee Paradis, Rebecca L. Robertson re: non-admitted status. (kkc)
September 27, 2013 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gregory Abbott, Devon Anderson, David Escamilla, Jaime Esparza, Rene Guerra, David Lakey, M.D., James E. Nichols, Matthew Powell, Susan D. Reed, Abelino Reyna, Mari Robinson, Joe Shannon, Jr., Craig Watkins. (kkc)
September 27, 2013 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice,, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services,, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. Corrected (George, R.)
September 27, 2013 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Austin Women's Health Center, Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Killeen Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice,, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services,, Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Pamela J. Richter, Lamar Robinson, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Whole Woman's Health. (George, R.)
September 27, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-5887465), filed by Southwestern Women's Surgery Center, Pamela J. Richter, Planned Parenthood Center for Choice,, Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, Routh Street Women's Clinic, Lamar Robinson, Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services,, Austin Women's Health Center, West Side Clinic, Inc., Alan Braid, Houston Women's Clinic, Whole Woman's Health, Killeen Women's Health Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(George, R.)
September 26, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS (LY) AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER: 1:13-cv-862-LY. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services et al v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Gregory Abbott
Represented By: Arthur C. D'Andrea
Represented By: Beth Klusmann
Represented By: Philip A. Lionberger
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Michael P. Murphy
Represented By: Andrew S. Oldham
Represented By: John B. Scott
Represented By: Gunnar P. Seaquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Escamilla
Represented By: Elaine A. Casas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lakey, M.D.
Represented By: Arthur C. D'Andrea
Represented By: Beth Klusmann
Represented By: Philip A. Lionberger
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Michael P. Murphy
Represented By: Andrew S. Oldham
Represented By: John B. Scott
Represented By: Gunnar P. Seaquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abelino Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mari Robinson
Represented By: Arthur C. D'Andrea
Represented By: Beth Klusmann
Represented By: Philip A. Lionberger
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Michael P. Murphy
Represented By: Andrew S. Oldham
Represented By: John B. Scott
Represented By: Gunnar P. Seaquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Shannon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Women's Health Center
Represented By: Esha Bhandari
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Braid
Represented By: Esha Bhandari
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Women's Clinic
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Renee Paradis
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Rebecca L. Robertson
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Killeen Women's Health Center
Represented By: Esha Bhandari
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Center for Choice
Represented By: Alice Clapman
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Sexual Healthcare Services
Represented By: Alice Clapman
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Women's Health Center
Represented By: Alice Clapman
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services
Represented By: Alice Clapman
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Helene T. Krasnoff
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Richter
Represented By: Esha Bhandari
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Robinson
Represented By: Esha Bhandari
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Routh Street Women's Clinic
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Renee Paradis
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Rebecca L. Robertson
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwestern Women's Surgery Center
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Represented By: Esha Bhandari
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Renee Paradis
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Rebecca L. Robertson
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Side Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Esha Bhandari
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whole Woman's Health
Represented By: Esha Bhandari
Represented By: Janet Crepps
Represented By: R. James George, Jr.
Represented By: Rico Reyes
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose von Kreisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Texas Eagle Forum
Represented By: Lawrence J. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Mitchell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?