Sullivan v. RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.
Plaintiff: Aaron Brothers, William Slade Sullivan and Rosemary Claus Sullivan
Defendant: Rick's Cabaret International, Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. formerly known as Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. doing business as Rick's Cabaret, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss, L. M. Osborn, B. B. Johnson, C. S. Mount, K. A. Mayo, A. P. Ballew, RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Rick, Officer Nathan J. Zoss, Officer Kristen A. Mayo and Officer Aaron P. Ballew
Petitioner: Martha Estrada
Case Number: 1:2014cv00349
Filed: April 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew W Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order EXHIBITS DESTROYED for Defendant.(lt)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order (Additional) EXHIBITS DESTROYED for Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan per request of counsel in lieu of pick up. (lt)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 EXHIBIT RECEIPT by Plaintiffs. (lt)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Exhibit Letter instructing parties to pick up their exhibits by 3/9/18. (lt)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 339 FINAL JUDGMENT, GRANTING #337 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., MOOTING #305 MOTION to Exclude Marc Chapman filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #324 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Final Judgment)(Rawson, Brian)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Exhibit List for JURY TRIAL held from October 2, 2017 to October 5, 2017. (td) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2017: #1 Pltfs exh 1, 4, 5, 6B, 8, 10-12, #2 Pltfs exh 13, part 1, #3 Pltfs exh 13, part 2, #4 Pltfs exb 13, part 3, #5 Pltfs exh 17, #6 Defts exh 2, 90, #7 Defts exh 157, 193) (klw). (Pltfs Audio/Video Exhibits 2, 3 and 6A and Defts 28 are not compatible with uploading electronically and will be kept on the exhibit shelf in the Clerk's Office thru the pendency of this action and any initial appeal, if applicable.) Modified on 10/12/2017 (klw).
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 335 JURY VERDICT (Redacted Version)for RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. filed. Unredacted Jury Verdict Sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (td) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2017: #1 Unredacted Jury Verdict) (td).
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 334 JURY NOTE 4 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (td)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 333 JURY NOTE 3 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (td)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 JURY NOTE 2 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (td)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 JURY NOTE 1 SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002. (td)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Court's Charge/Instructions to Jury. (td)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Witness List for JURY TRIAL held October 2, 2017 to October 5, 2017. (td)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Jury Trial completed on 10/5/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(td)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 STIPULATION as to the Authenticity of Plaintiffs' Medical Bills by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Barger, Darrell)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Jury Trial held on 10/4/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), (Jury Trial continued to 10/5/2017 at 9:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(td)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER OVERRULING #322 Supplemental Objections filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Miscellaneous Objection Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Supplemental Objections to Plaintiffs' Designation of Deposition Testimony by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Jury Trial held on 10/3/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), ( Jury Trial continued to 10/4/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(td)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Proposed Jury Instructions by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Jury Selection/Trial held on 10/2/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), (Jury Trial continued 10/3/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(td)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ANSWER to #313 Amended Complaint Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc..(Rawson, Brian)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Proposed Jury Instructions by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #317 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ck)
October 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Opposed MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Martha Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix to Non-Party Martha Estrada's Motion to Quash Subpoena, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Non-Party Martha Estrada's Motion to Quash)(Cookingham, Andrew)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER DENYING #287 Motion to exclude; DENYING #296 Motion to exclude Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant's Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 1 Concerning Medical Expenses Not "Actually Paid or Incurred" by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Errata D, #5 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #272 Motion in Limine; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #283 Motion in Limine; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #293 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. amending #244 Fourth Amended Complaint, filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Aaron Brothers.(ml)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER OVERRULING AS MOOT #294 Objection filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Aaron Brothers, #295 Objection filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 311 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant's Brief in Opposition to the Admissibility of Character Evidence by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rawson, Brian)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 TRIAL BRIEF on Admissibility of Medical Billing and Prior Conduct by Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #288 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ck)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #297 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. For the reasons stated on the record at the pretrial conference, this motion is GRANTED.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ck)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/28/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ERO.)(ml)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., re #287 MOTION to Exclude Untimely Produced Receipts filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Untimely Produced Receipts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Rawson, Brian)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SUPPLEMENT to #303 Witness/Exhibit/Expert List, Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Third Supplemental Designation of Potential Witnesses, Proposed Exhibits and Disclosure of Testifying Experts by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Defendant's Brief in Opposition to #272 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 Concerning Evidence of Criticism of Police Officers by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian) Modified on 9/28/2017 to create link (td).
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION to Exclude Marc Chapman by Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #296 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Erica Garza filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Third Supplemental Designation of Potential Witnesses, Proposed Exhibits and Disclosure of Testifying Experts. (Attachments: #1 Chapman CV)(Rawson, Brian)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Witness List by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' First Amended Exhibit List by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan.. (Spivey, Broadus)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #287 MOTION to Exclude Untimely Produced Receipts filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Exhibit List Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Second Amended List of Trial Exhibits by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc... (Rawson, Brian)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER re #282 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., #271 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Aaron Brothers. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed 5th Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Erica Garza by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Miscellaneous Objection to #292 Pretrial Disclosures Defendant's Objections to Plaintiffs' Designation of Deposition Testimony by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Miscellaneous Objection to #281 Trial Brief Plaintiffs Objections to Defendant's Deposition Designations by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Supplemental MOTION in Limine by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Pretrial Disclosures Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Deposition Designations by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ATTACHMENT (Proposed Order) to #288 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by St. David's Medical Center. (Cookingham, Andrew)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: for Andrew Cookingham re #288 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (ml)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 APPENDIX to #288 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by St. David's Medical Center. (Cookingham, Andrew)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by St. David's Medical Center. (Cookingham, Andrew)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTION to Exclude Untimely Produced Receipts by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s First Amended Local Rule 16(e) Report by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s First Amended Estimate of Trial Length by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION in Limine by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Proposed Jury Instructions by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s First Amended Deposition Designations by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Witness List by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Exhibit List Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s First Amended List of Trial Exhibits by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc... (Rawson, Brian)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s First Amended Proposed Stipulation of Facts by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s First Amended Statement of Defenses by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Rule 16(e) Report by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Voir Dire Questions, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Jury Instructions, #3 Exhibit C - Motion in Limine, #4 Exhibit D - Witness List, #5 Exhibit E - Exhibit List, #6 Exhibit F - Proposed Stipulated Facts)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 STIPULATION Proposed Stipulated Facts by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Exhibit List by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan.. (Spivey, Broadus)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Witness List by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION in Limine by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Proposed Jury Instructions by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Proposed Voir Dire by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Joint MOTION to Approve Jury Questionnaire by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Jury Questionnaire, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Style by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER regarding style. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER - the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE the sole remaining claim against the City of Round Rock. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #268 Motion entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (AWA)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER DENYING #202 Motion for Summary Judgment. The case remains set for a jury trial on October 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER DENYING #217 Motion for Reconsideration ; DENYING #245 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Recognition of Authority Cited by Defendant City of Round Rock by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SUPPLEMENT to #255 Response in Support of Motion, Additional Authority by The City of Round Rock, Texas. (Pierce, Archie)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., re #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Objection to Eric Garza's Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rawson, Brian)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. Response to Defendant's RCI's Objections to Plaintiffs' Resonse (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Garza Affidavit)(Spivey, Broadus)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., re #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Reply to the City of Round Rock's Response to its Motion for Summary Judgment (Rawson, Brian)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., re #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Objections and Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rawson, Brian)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE Service3rdAmdDisclosuresSuppDesignPotentialWitnessesExhibitsExperts by The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by The City of Round Rock, Texas, re #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Thompson, Mike)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESPONSE in Support, filed by The City of Round Rock, Texas, re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant K. A. Mayo, Defendant A. P. Ballew, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas, #217 MOTION for Reconsideration AlternativelySecondMtnSummaryJudgment filed by Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #202 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Spivey, Broadus) Modified on 8/8/2017 (ml). (Exhibit G (DVD)-Interview Video and Exhibit M (DVD)-Surveillance Video, are located in the Clerk Office)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #217 MOTION for Reconsideration AlternativelySecondMtnSummaryJudgment filed by Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas Plaintiffs Response to CORR Supplemental Authority in Support (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #217 MOTION for Reconsideration AlternativelySecondMtnSummaryJudgment filed by Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING #236 Motion for Leave to Designate Responsible Third Parties. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Memorandum in Support, filed by The City of Round Rock, Texas, re #217 MOTION for Reconsideration AlternativelySecondMtnSummaryJudgment filed by Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 RESPONSE in Support, filed by The City of Round Rock, Texas, re #245 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim AndBriefInSupportThereof filed by Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thompson, Mike)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #245 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim AndBriefInSupportThereof filed by Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s ANSWER to #244 Amended Complaint by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc..(Rawson, Brian)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ANSWER to #244 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by The City of Round Rock, Texas.(Thompson, Mike)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim AndBriefInSupportThereof by The City of Round Rock, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., The City of Round Rock, Texas amending #71 Third Amended Complaint, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan.(ml)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING #234 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' FourthAmended Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., re #236 MOTION For Leave to Designate Responsible Third Parties filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Rawson, Brian)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., re #236 MOTION For Leave to Designate Responsible Third Parties filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Rawson, Brian)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #236 MOTION For Leave to Designate Responsible Third Parties filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by The City of Round Rock, Texas, re #236 MOTION For Leave to Designate Responsible Third Parties filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Memorandum in Support, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #234 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER, (Jury Trial set for 10/2/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin,). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MOTION For Leave to Designate Responsible Third Parties by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by The City of Round Rock, Texas, re #234 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed 4th Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE Unavailability of Atty by The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER, Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings is due 04/24/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Status Conference held on 4/13/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ERO.)(ml)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER lifting stay. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Pretrial Disclosures Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Rick's Cabaret International, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Designation of Potential Witnesses, Proposed Exhibits and Disclosure of Testifying Experts by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Pretrial Disclosures Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Second Supplemental Designation of Potential Witnesses, Proposed Exhibits and Disclosure of Testifying Experts by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 4/13/2017 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin,). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 WRIT OF CERTIORARI re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, DENIED by US Supreme Court (ml)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #225 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ddd)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, William Slade Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kuhn, Kurt)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING #221 Amended MOTION to Stay Case Pending Appeal filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Aaron Brothers, DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #127 MOTION in Limine filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #138 MOTION in Limine filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Aaron Brothers,.; (Jury Trial set for 6/19/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin, Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin,). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Status Conference held on 11/7/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ERO.)(ml)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Amended MOTION to Stay Case Pending Appeal by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Appeal by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The City of Round Rock, Texas AmendedCertificateOfService #217 MOTION for Reconsideration AlternativelySecondMtnSummaryJudgment (Thompson, Mike)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Mike Thompson, Jr.: re #217 MOTION for Reconsideration AlternativelySecondMtnSummaryJudgment. (td)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION for Reconsideration AlternativelySecondMtnSummaryJudgment by The City of Round Rock, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Appeal Record for #54 exhibits 1 (attachment 3, 4, 5) and #60 exhibit 4 (1 DVD) Returned by USCA. (ml)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. Second Supplemental Designation. (Rawson, Brian)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. Second Supplemental Designation. (Rawson, Brian)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE all claims against Nathan J. Zoss, Aaron P. Ballew and Kristen A. Mayo. (Status Conference set for 11/7/2016 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin,). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Reversing and Remanding #159 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by Aaron P. Ballew, Nathan J. Zoss, Kristen A. Mayo. (ml)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE Unavailability of Atty by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss (Thompson, Mike)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (ml)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER of USCA Granting Appellant's Motion to Supplement the Record re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory.(td)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE Unavailability of Atty by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss (Thompson, Mike)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on February 16, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/13/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2016, Appeal Record due by 4/7/2016, (Reznik, Lily)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER, postponing all deadlines and settings in this case. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Stayed per order filed 03/07/2016. (ml)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of Postponement of Pending Filings by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan (Spivey, Broadus)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) Granting Appellants' Motion to Stay pending Appeal. (ml)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for dates of 02/16/2016. Proceedings Transcribed: Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter: ERO. (ml)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER, (Jury Trial set for 3/28/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2016 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin,). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION for Summary Judgment by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (ml)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING #170 Motion for Reconsideration Order Denying Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew W. Austin: Scheduling Conference held on 2/16/2016 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ERO.)(ml)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER DENYING #194 Motion for Leave to Conditionally Designate Responsible Third Parties. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DENYING #152 Motion to to Limit the Testimony of Robert Cain, MD; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #160 Motion to Partially Reconsider Order on Daubert Motions; DENYING #166 Motion to Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Robert Cain, MD. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER, (Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2016 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin,). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. (ml)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #194 MOTION for Leave to Conditionally Designate Responsible Third Parties filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION for Leave to Conditionally Designate Responsible Third Parties by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER, (Jury Trial set for 3/28/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin,). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Miscellaneous Objection to #184 Miscellaneous Objection Reply in Support of Objections to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Expert Reports by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #170 MOTION for Reconsideration re #143 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Rawson, Brian)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #166 MOTION to Exclude Motion to Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Robert Cain, MD filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Rawson, Brian)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (ml)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #160 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Reconsider Order on Daubert Motions filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #166 MOTION to Exclude Motion to Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Robert Cain, MD filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #170 MOTION for Reconsideration re #143 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #160 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Reconsider Order on Daubert Motions filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #160 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Reconsider Order on Daubert Motions filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Miscellaneous Objection to #171 Memorandum in Support, of Expert Reports by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss, re #160 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Reconsider Order on Daubert Motions filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss, re #152 MOTION to Strike Limit Testimony Robert Cain filed by Defendant Aaron P. Ballew, Defendant Kristen A. Mayo, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, Nathan J. Zoss re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, #159 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed). (ml)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss for date of 12/18/2015. Proceedings Transcribed: Pre-Trial Hearing. Court Reporter: Arlinda Rodriguez. (ml)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: for Broadus Autry Spivey re #177 Response to Motion. (ml)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #170 MOTION for Reconsideration re #143 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #166 MOTION to Exclude Motion to Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Robert Cain, MD filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #174 Response in Opposition to Motion, by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: for Brian Rawson re #174 Response in Opposition to Motion. (ml)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #160 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Reconsider Order on Daubert Motions filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rawson, Brian)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on December 18, 2015, Proceedings Transcribed: Final Pretrial Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 1/19/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/28/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/28/2016, Appeal Record due by 1/12/2016, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER SUSPENDING Any Pending Deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Memorandum in Support of Expert Reports by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary of Cain Report, #2 Exhibit B - Summary of Kirkham Report, #3 Exhibit C - Summary of Yarbrough Report)(Spivey, Broadus)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION for Reconsideration re #143 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #152 MOTION to Strike Limit Testimony Robert Cain filed by Defendant Aaron P. Ballew, Defendant Kristen A. Mayo, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cain's Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B - Cain's Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Crown's Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Medical Examiner's Report, #5 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Andrew W. Austin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (ml)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #161 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (ml)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION to Exclude Motion to Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Robert Cain, MD by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rawson, Brian)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Pretrial Conference held on 12/18/2015 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(ml)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thompson, Mike)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Interlocutory Appeal by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Reconsider Order on Daubert Motions by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL #159 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, Nathan J. Zoss as to #143 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0542-8046807. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (ml)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #143 by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, Nathan J. Zoss. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-8046807) (Thompson, Mike)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Pretrial Disclosures Supplemental Disclosures Testifying Experts by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 RESPONSE Defendants RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. and RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Objection to Plaintiffs'Designation of Deposition Testimony to #139 Witness List by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 RESPONSE Defendants RCI Hospitality Holdings,Inc. and RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Stipulation to Plaintiffs' Proposed Stipulated Facts to #141 Stipulation by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #138 MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Rawson, Brian)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 RESPONSE Defendants RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. and RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List to #140 Exhibit List by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss, re #138 MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers PLExhibitsStipFactsDepoOffer (Thompson, Mike)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION to Strike Limit Testimony Robert Cain by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Miscellaneous Objection to #132 Trial Brief, #128 Exhibit List RespObjectionsToSpecificDepositionTestimonyExhibitsPropStipulations by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 RESPONSE Objections to Co-Defendants City of Round Rock, Officers Nathan J. Zoss, Kristen A. Mayo and Aaron P. Ballew's Exhibit List to #123 Exhibit List by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 RESPONSE Objection to Co-Defendants City of Round Rock, Officers Nathan J. Zoss, Kristen A. Mayo and Aaron P. Ballew's Designation of Deposition Testimony to #124 Witness List by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 RESPONSE Stipulation to Co-Defendants City of Round Rock, Officers Nathan J. Zoss, Kristen A. Mayo and Aaron P. Ballew's Proposed Stipulated Facts to #121 Trial Brief by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 RESPONSE to Co-Defendants City of Round Rock, Officers Nathan J. Zoss, Kristen A. Mayo and Aaron P. Ballew's Motions in Limine to #121 Trial Brief by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE to #121 Trial Brief by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, William Slade Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, William Slade Sullivan, re #127 MOTION in Limine filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING #56 Motion to exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Camille Wortman; DENYING #57 Motion to Limit or Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Camille Wortman, Ph.D.; GRANTING #77 Motion to exclude Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert George Kirkham; DENYING #97 Motion to exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. George Berry, Ph.D.; DENYING #98 Motion to exclude to Limit or Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert George William Berry; GRANTING #102 Motion to exclude Expert Testimony of Randy Yarbrough; DENYING #106 Motion to to Limit the Testimony of Kendall Crowns, MD. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (ml)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DENYING #54 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants City of Round Rock, Officers N.J. Zoss, K.A. Mayo, and A.P. Ballew; DENYING #55 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Rick's Cabaret International, Inc.'s; DENYING #113 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (ml)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Rule 16(3) Report by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Voir Dire, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Jury Instructions, #3 Exhibit C - Motion in Limine, #4 Exhibit D - Witness List and Depo Designations, #5 Exhibit E - Exhibit List, #6 Exhibit F - Proposed Stipulated Facts)(Spivey, Broadus)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION Plaintiffs' Proposed Stipulated Facts by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Exhibit List by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan.. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Witness List by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION in Limine by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Proposed Voir Dire by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Proposed Jury Instructions by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Proposed Jury Instructions by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Proposed Voir Dire by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Designations. (Spivey, Broadus)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 TRIAL BRIEF Local Rule 16(e) Report for Pretrial Filings by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Defenses for Voir Dire, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Stipulation of Facts, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition Designations, #4 Exhibit D - Estimate of Trial Length)(Rawson, Brian)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Proposed Jury Instructions by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Proposed Voir Dire by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Witness List by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Exhibit List by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc... (Rawson, Brian)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION in Limine by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Proposed Jury Instructions by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Proposed Jury Instructions by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Witness List by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Exhibit List by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss.. (Thompson, Mike)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Proposed Voir Dire by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TRIAL BRIEF PreTrialReport by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PropStipFactsEstLengthTrial, #2 Exhibit MotionInLimine)(Thompson, Mike)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Roark, Stephanie)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. . (Roark, Stephanie)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #114 MOTION to supplement re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental Authority in Support filed by Defendant Aaron P. Ballew, Defendant Nathan J. Zoss, Defendant Kristen A. Mayo, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER, resetting Final Pretrial Conference for 12/18/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (ml)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss, re #113 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Thompson, Mike)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #113 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Spivey, Broadus)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SUPPLEMENT re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental Authority in Support by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike) Modified on 11/12/2015 to correct the event (ml).
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MSJ, #2 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss First Supplemental Designation. (Pierce, Archie)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss, re #106 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively to Limit Testimony of Kendall Crowns, MD filed by Defendant Aaron P. Ballew, Defendant Nathan J. Zoss, Defendant Kristen A. Mayo, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss, re #106 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively to Limit Testimony of Kendall Crowns, MD filed by Defendant Aaron P. Ballew, Defendant Nathan J. Zoss, Defendant Kristen A. Mayo, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #106 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively to Limit Testimony of Kendall Crowns, MD filed by Defendant Aaron P. Ballew, Defendant Nathan J. Zoss, Defendant Kristen A. Mayo, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Rawson, Brian)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #106 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively to Limit Testimony of Kendall Crowns, MD filed by Defendant Aaron P. Ballew, Defendant Nathan J. Zoss, Defendant Kristen A. Mayo, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #102 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively to Limit Expert Testimony of Randy Yarbrough filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A-D)(Rawson, Brian)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively to Limit Testimony of Kendall Crowns, MD by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Proposed Order)(Pierce, Archie)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, William Slade Sullivan, re #102 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively to Limit Expert Testimony of Randy Yarbrough filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #97 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. George Berry, Ph.D. filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Rawson, Brian)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss, re #98 MOTION to Exclude Testimony PL Expert George Berry filed by Defendant Aaron P. Ballew, Defendant Nathan J. Zoss, Defendant Kristen A. Mayo, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION to Exclude or Alternatively to Limit Expert Testimony of Randy Yarbrough by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Appendix, #3 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, William Slade Sullivan, re #98 MOTION to Exclude Testimony PL Expert George Berry filed by Defendant Aaron P. Ballew, Defendant Nathan J. Zoss, Defendant Kristen A. Mayo, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, William Slade Sullivan, re #97 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. George Berry, Ph.D. filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s #94 Motion to Join Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Camille Wortman [Doc. No. 56]. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (ml)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Exclude Testimony PL Expert George Berry by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. George Berry, Ph.D. by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc., RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Pearman, Nathan)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #94 MOTION to Join Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Camille Wortman [ Doc No. 56] by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #94 MOTION to Join Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Camille Wortman [ Doc No. 56] Proposed Orders are Required when a non-dispositive Motion (or Amended Motion) is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please, file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "ATTACHMENT" event from the menu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Motion. In the Docket Text, type "(Proposed Order)". (ml)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION to Join Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Camille Wortman [ Doc No. 56] by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Defendant RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.'s Original ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Brian Rawson added to party RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.(pty:dft) by RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc..(Rawson, Brian)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.'s ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc..(Rawson, Brian)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant K. A. Mayo, Defendant A. P. Ballew, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus) Modified on 9/9/2015 to remove filer (os).
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Miscellaneous Objection Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Objections to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Evidence by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mike Thompson, Jr (Thompson, Mike)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by A. P. Ballew, Aaron P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss, Nathan J. Zoss, re #77 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Kirkham filed by Defendant K. A. Mayo, Defendant A. P. Ballew, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Original ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party Aaron P. Ballew(pty:dft), Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party Kristen A. Mayo(pty:dft), Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party Nathan J. Zoss(pty:dft) by Aaron P. Ballew, Kristen A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss.(Thompson, Mike)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Miscellaneous Objection to #61 Response to Motion,, Summary Judgment Evidence by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, William Slade Sullivan, re #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Rick's Cabaret (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, William Slade Sullivan, re #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Rick's Cabaret (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF POTENTIAL WITNESSES, PROPOSED EXHIBITS AND DISCLOSURE OF TESTIFYING EXPERTS LIST by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. . (Roark, Stephanie) Modified on 8/28/2015 to include full title (ml).
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, William Slade Sullivan, re #77 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Kirkham filed by Defendant K. A. Mayo, Defendant A. P. Ballew, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Rick's Cabaret (Rawson, Brian)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESPONSE in Support, filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Rick's Cabaret RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Evidence (Rawson, Brian)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE in Support, filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Rick's Cabaret RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Summary Judgment Evidence (Rawson, Brian)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE in Support, filed by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, N. J. Zoss, re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant K. A. Mayo, Defendant A. P. Ballew, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Kirkham by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE in Support, filed by The City of Round Rock, Texas, re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant K. A. Mayo, Defendant A. P. Ballew, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Summons Issued as to RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. (dm)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. CORRECTED (Spivey, Broadus)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #72 Request for Issuance of Summons (os)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., The City of Round Rock, Texas, Nathan J. Zoss, Kristen A. Mayo, Aaron P. Ballew, RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc. amending #15 Amended Complaint, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan.(jk)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING #49 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING #41 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Aaron Brothers. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jk)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss, re #57 MOTION to Exclude Testimony filed by Defendant K. A. Mayo, Defendant A. P. Ballew, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Thompson, Mike) Modified on 8/14/2015 to correct docket event type. (jk).
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #56 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Camille Wortman filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. (Rawson, Brian)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan CORRECTED #63 Affidavit in Support (Spivey, Broadus)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan CORRECTED #62 Affidavit in Support (Spivey, Broadus)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #63 Affidavit in Support. (jk)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #62 Affidavit in Support. (jk)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #61 Response to Motion,, by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #60 Response to Motion, by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant K. A. Mayo, Defendant A. P. Ballew, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus) Modified on 8/12/2015: Exhibit 4 is a DVD which is not available electronically. DVD is maintained in the Clerk's Office. (jk).
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #56 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Camille Wortman filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #57 MOTION to Exclude Testimony filed by Defendant K. A. Mayo, Defendant A. P. Ballew, Defendant N. J. Zoss, Defendant The City of Round Rock, Texas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Exclude Testimony by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Camille Wortman by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Rick's Cabaret International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Mike)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. . (Roark, Stephanie)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss (Thompson, Mike)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss . (Thompson, Mike)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE Unavailability of Atty by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss (Thompson, Mike)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #41 Motion for Leave to File Document, filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Aaron Brothers. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jk)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #41 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. (jk)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan, re #41 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Spivey, Broadus)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #41 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Aaron Brothers. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (jk)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint to #44 Response in Opposition to Motion, by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #44 Response in Opposition to Motion. (jk)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., re #41 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rosemary Claus Sullivan, Plaintiff Aaron Brothers (Rawson, Brian)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION to Extend the Deadline to object to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Filing Notice Service of Disclosures by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss (Thompson, Mike)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Aaron Brothers, Rosemary Claus Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. Texas Franchise Tax Public Information Report, #2 Exhibit B - Rick's Cabaret Certificate of Amendment, #3 Exhibit C - RCI Dining Services Texas Franchise Tax Public Information Report, #4 Exhibit D - SOS Inquiry showing Assumed Name, #5 Exhibit E - Randy Yarbrough Report, #6 Exhibit F - George Kirkham Report, #7 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #8 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by Rosemary Claus Sullivan . (Spivey, Broadus)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jk)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Lee Yeakel, ADR Report Deadline due by 1/30/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2014, Discovery due by 10/30/2015, Joinder of Parties due by 12/8/2014, Motions due by 7/24/2015. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jk)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING #29 Report and Recommendations; DENYING #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jk)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/17/2015 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(jk)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thompson, Mike)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Substitute Party. Rosemary Claus Sullivan substituted for William Slade Sullivan as Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the style in the case remaining before this court be modified as noted in the style utilized in this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jk)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #30 OBJECTION to #29 Report and Recommendations Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. Reply in Support of Defendant's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommendations Regarding Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Rawson, Brian) Modified on 2/2/2015 (jk).
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ADR Report Filed - CONSENT to Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss(Rawson, Brian)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Response , filed by William Slade Sullivan, re #30 OBJECTION to #29 Report and Recommendations Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. (Kuhn, Kurt) Modified docket event type on 1/26/2015 (jk).
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OBJECTION to #29 Report and Recommendations Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Rick's Cabaret International, Inc... (Rawson, Brian)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jk)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (jk)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Broadus Autry Spivey on behalf of William Slade Sullivan (Spivey, Broadus)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 3/17/2015 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Disclosures by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. (Rawson, Brian) Modified on 12/2/2014 to correct filing party by removing terminated party Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. (jk).
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Proposed Scheduling Order by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Rawson (Rawson, Brian)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Rick's Cabaret International, Inc., re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. (Rawson, Brian)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (jk)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by William Slade Sullivan, re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Defendant Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. (Spivey, Broadus)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss.(Thompson, Mike)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) Modified on 10/31/2014 to correct link (td).
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by William Slade Sullivan, re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. (Spivey, Broadus)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/17/2014. (td)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Original ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Brian Rawson added to party RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc..(Rawson, Brian)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc., Rick's Cabaret International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, Rick's Cabaret International, Inc., The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss amending, filed by William Slade Sullivan.(Spivey, Broadus)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jk)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by William Slade Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Parties by Rick's Cabaret International, Inc.. (Rawson, Brian)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Rick's Cabaret International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Brian)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to William Slade Sullivan and Motion to Substitute Proper Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Broadus) Modified on 8/20/2014 (jk).
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Slade Sullivan. Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. served on 8/14/2014, answer due 9/4/2014. (Spivey, Broadus)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. (jk)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by William Slade Sullivan. (Spivey, Broadus)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A. P. Ballew, K. A. Mayo, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss, Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. amending #1 Complaint, filed by William Slade Sullivan.(jk)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pretrial Disclosures by A. P. Ballew, B. B. Johnson, K. A. Mayo, C. S. Mount, L. M. Osborn, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by A. P. Ballew, B. B. Johnson, K. A. Mayo, C. S. Mount, L. M. Osborn, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss. (Thompson, Mike)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party A. P. Ballew(pty:dft), Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party B. B. Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party K. A. Mayo(pty:dft), Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party C. S. Mount(pty:dft), Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party L. M. Osborn(pty:dft), Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party The City of Round Rock, Texas(pty:dft), Attorney Mike Thompson, Jr added to party N. J. Zoss(pty:dft) by A. P. Ballew, B. B. Johnson, K. A. Mayo, C. S. Mount, L. M. Osborn, The City of Round Rock, Texas, N. J. Zoss.(Thompson, Mike)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron Brothers as to All Defendants. (Spivey, Broadus)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (os)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aaron Brothers. (os)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6432928). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Aaron Brothers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Spivey, Broadus) Modified on 4/24/2014 to correct party name (os).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick's Cabaret International, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Rawson
Represented By: Darrell L. Barger
Represented By: Larry D. Grayson
Represented By: Roy B. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. formerly known as Rick's Cabaret International, Inc. doing business as Rick's Cabaret
Represented By: Brian Rawson
Represented By: Darrell L. Barger
Represented By: Larry D. Grayson
Represented By: Roy B. McKay
Represented By: Stephanie Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Round Rock, Texas
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Christopher Allen Shuley
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. J. Zoss
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. M. Osborn
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. B. Johnson
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. S. Mount
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. A. Mayo
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. P. Ballew
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCI Dining Services (Round Rock), Inc.
Represented By: Brian Rawson
Represented By: Darrell L. Barger
Represented By: Larry D. Grayson
Represented By: Roy B. McKay
Represented By: Stephanie Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Darrell L. Barger
Represented By: Brian Rawson
Represented By: Larry D. Grayson
Represented By: Roy B. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick
Represented By: Brian Rawson
Represented By: Darrell L. Barger
Represented By: Larry D. Grayson
Represented By: Roy B. McKay
Represented By: Stephanie Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Nathan J. Zoss
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Christopher Allen Shuley
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kristen A. Mayo
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Christopher Allen Shuley
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Aaron P. Ballew
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Christopher Allen Shuley
Represented By: Mike Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Brothers
Represented By: Broadus Autry Spivey
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Turner
Represented By: Richard Alan Grigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Slade Sullivan
Represented By: Broadus Autry Spivey
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Turner
Represented By: Kurt H. Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Claus Sullivan
Represented By: Broadus Autry Spivey
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Turner
Represented By: Kurt H. Kuhn
Represented By: Richard Alan Grigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martha Estrada
Represented By: Andrew Cookingham
Represented By: James Patrick Bredehoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?