Yeti Coolers, LLC v. RTIC Coolers, LLC
Plaintiff: Yeti Coolers, LLC
Defendant: RTIC Coolers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00597
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER GRANTING 391 Motion to Enforce Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
January 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER DENYING 238 Sealed Motion to Exclude (Rebecca Kirk Fair). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER GRANTING 229 Sealed Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Tülin Erdem. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER DENYING 242 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 134 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeti Coolers, LLC v. RTIC Coolers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTIC Coolers, LLC
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Represented By: Bailey Harris
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: P. Weston Musselman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeti Coolers, LLC
Represented By: Joseph J. Berghammer
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Gray
Represented By: Michael Krashin
Represented By: Mysha Lubke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?