OCA-Greater Houston et al v. State of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Mallika Das and OCA-Greater Houston
Defendant: Carlos Cascos, City of Round Rock, State of Texas and Williamson County Elections Department
Case Number: 1:2015cv00679
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973 Voting Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING 87 OCAs Motion for Post-Judgment Attorneys' Fees, Costs, andExpenses. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER REVISING Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING 64 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (ml)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING 61 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (ml)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER, the Court ENJOINS the provisions of the Texas Election Code are inconsistent with the Voting Rights Act and SUPPLEMENTS its August 12th Order to incorporate the contents of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (ml)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OCA-Greater Houston et al v. State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Cascos
Represented By: Laura Alicia Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Round Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Represented By: Laura Alicia Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson County Elections Department
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallika Das
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCA-Greater Houston
Represented By: David M. Hoffman
Represented By: Jerry Vattamala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?