Rouse v. Austin Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Rouse
Defendant: Austin Police Department, Housing Authority of the City of Austin, Travis County Sheriff Office, Officer Cody Miller, Officer Andrew Heimsath and Officer Orlando Ramos
Case Number: 1:2015cv00721
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Dismissing #26 Notice of Appeal, filed by Stephen E. Rouse. (jf)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re #26 Notice of Appeal,,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (os)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING #27 Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal. by Stephen E. Rouse. (os)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Stephen E. Rouse. Filing fee $ 505.00 is DUE. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (os)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Dismiss. DENYING #24 Motion for a Refund of Partial Filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims brought by Plaintiff Stephen E. Rouse in the above-styled cause are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Rouse shall have FIFTEEN (15) DAYS from the date of the hearing in which to file any amended complaint. Terminated parties: Orlando Ramos, Andrew Heimsath and Cody Miller. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for a Refund of Partial Filing Fee by Stephen E. Rouse. (os)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2015 re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Heimsath, Cody Miller (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(td)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Motion to Dismiss #19 Amended Complaint . Attorney Shelly Singh added to party Andrew Heimsath(pty:dft), Attorney Shelly Singh added to party Cody Miller(pty:dft) by Andrew Heimsath, Cody Miller.(Singh, Shelly) Modified on 10/28/2015 to correct document type. (os).
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting Hearing on all Pending Matters for 11/6/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Waiver of Service of Summons by Stephen E. Rouse. (os)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Heimsath, Cody Miller, Orlando Ramos amending #1 Complaint., filed by Stephen E. Rouse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope)(os)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Dismiss by Travis County Sheriff Office; GRANTING #11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Housing Authority of the City of Austin; GRANTING #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Austin Police Department. The Court will allow Stephen E. Rouse twenty (20) days from the date of the entry of this order to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Proposed Order re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of subject-Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Housing Authority of the City of Austin. (Ewbank, James) Modified on 9/25/2015 to correct document type (os).
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Stephen E. Rouse, re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Austin Police Department (os)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Electronic Filing Access. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Stephen E. Rouse, re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of subject-Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Housing Authority of the City of Austin (os)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter to the Court from Stephen E. Rouse. (os)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Austin Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Riley, Meghan)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of subject-Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Housing Authority of the City of Austin. (Ewbank, James) Modified on 9/15/2015 to edit text (os).
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Shelly Singh's #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shelly Singh and receipt for Filing fee $ 100.00 receipt number 100025223, by Austin Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(os)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Rouse. Travis County Sheriff Office served on 8/27/2015, answer due 9/17/2015. (os)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Rouse. Austin Police Department served on 8/26/2015, answer due 9/16/2015. (os)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Rouse. Housing Authority of the City of Austin served on 8/26/2015, answer due 9/16/2015. (os)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Stephen E. Rouse, re #3 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Travis County Sheriff Office (os)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Electronic Filing Access by Stephen E. Rouse. (os)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) by Travis County Sheriff Office. (Eiserloh, Laurie) Modified on 9/4/2015 to edit text (os).
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Austin Police Department, Housing Authority of the City of Austin, Travis County Sheriff Office. (klw)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephen E. Rouse. (so)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100024998), filed by Stephen E. Rouse.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt)(so)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse v. Austin Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen E. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Police Department
Represented By: Shelly Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Austin
Represented By: James B. Ewbank, II
Represented By: Jack Q. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis County Sheriff Office
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Laurie R. Eiserloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cody Miller
Represented By: Shelly Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Andrew Heimsath
Represented By: Shelly Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Orlando Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?