UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Grande Communications Networks LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Christian Music Group, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fonovisa, Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Tooth & Nail, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc. and Zomba Recording LLC
Defendant: Grande Communications Networks LLC and Patriot Media Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00365
Filed: April 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER DENYING 247 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER DENYING 210 Motion to exclude; DENYING 214 Motion to exclude; MOOTING 221 Motion to exclude; DENYING 228 Motion to exclude; DENYING 233 Motion to exclude; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 265 Motion to exclude Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 127 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Zomba Recording LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros. Records In c., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Nonesuch Records Inc., Arista Music, Tooth & Nail, LLC, LaFace Records LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Fonovisa, Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Capitol Christian Music Group, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Arista Records LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING 107 Motion for Protective Order; DENYING 135 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER DENYING Motions to Seal (Dkt. Nos. 109, 112, 120, 128, 141, 147, 158, 166, 173, 177, and 180). Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 85 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that the district judge DENY UMG Recording, Inc., et als Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Grande Communications Networks LLC, 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patriot Media Consulting, LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Grande Communications Networks LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Music
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Records LLC
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Christian Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Records, LLC
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fonovisa, Inc.
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fueled by Ramen LLC
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaFace Records LLC
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nonesuch Records Inc.
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhino Entertainment Company
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roadrunner Records, Inc.
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tooth & Nail, LLC
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Records Inc.
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zomba Recording LLC
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grande Communications Networks LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Brophy
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: John R. Johnson
Represented By: Diana L. Nichols
Represented By: J. Stephen Ravel
Represented By: Margaret R. Szewczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Media Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Brophy
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: John R. Johnson
Represented By: Diana L. Nichols
Represented By: J. Stephen Ravel
Represented By: Margaret R. Szewczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?