Harris et al v. Chavez et al
Plaintiff: Bonar Crump, Jr., Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia and Drew King
Defendant: County of McLennan, Walter H. Peterson, Peaktastic Beverage, LLC, Manuel Chavez, John Does, City of Waco, Chief Brent Stroman, Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC, Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Abelino Reyna, Patrick Swanton, Christopher Frost, Det. Jeffrey Rogers, Steven Schwartz, Robert Lanning and Peaktastic Beverage, LLC doing business as Twin Peaks Restaurant
Case Number: 1:2017cv00426
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
2 Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 115 ANSWER to #91 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Christopher Frost, Steven Schwartz.(Liller, Harold)
March 24, 2020 Filing 114 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Order Consolidating Case entered in 1:16-cv-648-ADA. This case, 1:17-cv-426-ADA, is consolidated into 1:16-cv-648 (Lead Case). The pending Motions to Dismiss previously filed in this case (Dkt. Nos. #95 , #96 , #97 will be entered onto the docket record of the lead case by the Clerk of the Court and proceed in that case. No further pleadings are to be filed in this case. (lt)
May 17, 2019 Filing 113 Sur-reply to Motion, filed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King, re #97 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant County of McLennan, Defendant Abelino Reyna, #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Robert Lanning, Defendant Manuel Chavez, Defendant Patrick Swanton, Defendant Brent Stroman, Defendant City of Waco, Defendant Jeffrey Rogers, #95 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Steven Schwartz, Defendant Christopher Frost Corrected Sur-Reply to City, County, and DPS Defendants' Replies ISO Motions to Dismiss (Tittle, Don)
May 9, 2019 Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King, re #97 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant County of McLennan, Defendant Abelino Reyna, #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Robert Lanning, Defendant Manuel Chavez, Defendant Patrick Swanton, Defendant Brent Stroman, Defendant City of Waco, Defendant Jeffrey Rogers, #95 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Steven Schwartz, Defendant Christopher Frost Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply to All Defendants' Replies (Tittle, Don)
May 2, 2019 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King, re #97 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant County of McLennan, Defendant Abelino Reyna Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Extrinsic Evidence (Tittle, Don)
April 25, 2019 Filing 110 RESPONSE to #101 Miscellaneous Objection, by County of McLennan, Abelino Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brandt, Thomas)
April 25, 2019 Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by County of McLennan, Abelino Reyna, re #97 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant County of McLennan, Defendant Abelino Reyna (Brandt, Thomas)
April 25, 2019 Filing 108 BRIEF regarding #95 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Christopher Frost, Steven Schwartz. (Liller, Harold)
April 25, 2019 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, Robert Lanning, Jeffrey Rogers, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton, re #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Robert Lanning, Defendant Manuel Chavez, Defendant Patrick Swanton, Defendant Brent Stroman, Defendant City of Waco, Defendant Jeffrey Rogers (Olson, Charles)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER regarding page limits and sur-reply deadline. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Extending Filing Deadlines. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
April 3, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissal with Prejudice)(Winton, James)
March 28, 2019 Filing 102 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King, re #97 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant County of McLennan, Defendant Abelino Reyna, #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Robert Lanning, Defendant Manuel Chavez, Defendant Patrick Swanton, Defendant Brent Stroman, Defendant City of Waco, Defendant Jeffrey Rogers, #95 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Steven Schwartz, Defendant Christopher Frost Omnibus Response to All Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tittle, Don)
March 28, 2019 Filing 101 Miscellaneous Objection to Defendant Reyna and McLennan County's Exhibits and Arguments Using Extrinsic Evidence in Support of their Motion to Dismiss by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King. (Tittle, Don)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #100 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit and File Omnibus Response entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff be allowed to file a single, unified Response to all Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff may exceed 35 pages but may not exceed 105 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt)
March 22, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and File Omnibus Response by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Tittle, Don)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Extending Filing Deadlines. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (td)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske. (dm)
February 19, 2019 Filing 97 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by County of McLennan, Abelino Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Errata 6, #7 Proposed Order)(Brandt, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, Robert Lanning, Jeffrey Rogers, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dixon, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Christopher Frost, Steven Schwartz. (Liller, Harold)
February 14, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(McKeon, Tressie)
February 3, 2019 Filing 93 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One--Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Winton, James)
February 1, 2019 Filing 92 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One--Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Winton, James)
January 17, 2019 Filing 91 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand against All Defendants amending, filed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King.(Tittle, Don)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION and Order by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Winton, James)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting Partial Lift of Stay and Setting Deadlines. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
November 30, 2018 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 11/30/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(dm)
November 30, 2018 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 11/30/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(dm)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER, ( Telephone Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright,). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 84 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Winton, James)
October 9, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Don Tittle on behalf of Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King. Attorney Don Tittle added to party Bonar Crump, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Don Tittle added to party Juan Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Don Tittle added to party Jim Albert Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Don Tittle added to party Drew King(pty:pla) (Tittle, Don)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDERED that the above-styled and numbered cause is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Alan Albright, United States District Judge, for all purposes. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
September 24, 2018 Filing 81 STATUS REPORT of Defendants Reyna and McLennan County Pursuant to the Court's Order of September 4, 2018 by County of McLennan, Abelino Reyna. (Brandt, Thomas)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDERED that all proceedings in these cases remain STAYED WITHOUT PREJUDICE until further order from the Court. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
August 23, 2018 Filing 79 STATUS REPORT by County of McLennan, Abelino Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brandt, Thomas)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING #40 Motion to Dismiss ; DISMISSING #41 Motion to Dismiss ; DISMISSING #44 Motion to Dismiss ; DISMISSING #48 Motion ; DISMISSING #64 Motion to Lift Stay; DISMISSING #15 Motion to Transfer Case; DISMISSING #16 Motion to Stay Case; DISMISSING #17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
August 10, 2018 Filing 77 STATUS REPORT by County of McLennan, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna. (Brandt, Thomas)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDERED that all proceedings in these cases remain STAYED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for another sixty (60) days. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
July 11, 2018 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, County of McLennan, John Does, Christopher Frost, Robert Lanning, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna, Jeffrey Rogers, Steven Schwartz, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC.(Winton, James)
July 11, 2018 Filing 74 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Winton, James)
July 9, 2018 Filing 73 STATUS REPORT by County of McLennan, Abelino Reyna. (Brandt, Thomas)
June 11, 2018 Filing 72 STATUS REPORT of Defendants Abel Reyna and McLennan County, Texas Pursuant to The Court Order of April 10, 2018 by County of McLennan, Abelino Reyna. (Brandt, Thomas)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING #57 Motion for Partial and Limited Lifting of Stay. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
May 14, 2018 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC, re #64 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC, Defendant Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Defendant Peaktastic Beverage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Partial Lifting of Stay)(Winton, James)
May 10, 2018 Filing 69 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to The Court's Order of April 10, 2018 by County of McLennan, Abelino Reyna. (Brandt, Thomas)
May 8, 2018 Filing 68 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, Robert Lanning, Jeffrey Rogers, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton, re #64 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC, Defendant Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Defendant Peaktastic Beverage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dixon, Michael)
May 8, 2018 Filing 67 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by County of McLennan, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna, re #64 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Defendant Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC, Defendant Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Defendant Peaktastic Beverage, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henninger, Stephen)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #63 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
May 1, 2018 Filing 65 Proposed Pretrial Order to Motion for Partial and Limited Lifting of Stay by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Winton, James)
May 1, 2018 Notice of Correction: re #63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. **When filing a Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations in the AUSTIN Division, the document which exceeds the page limit should NOT be attached to the motion, but rather filed as a separate pleading. We will take the necessary steps to pull the document from the Motion for leave to exceed page limit and get it added to the docket record. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (dm)
April 30, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION for Partial and Limited Lifting of Stay by Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Peaktastic Beverage, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC. (dm)
April 30, 2018 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Partial Lift of Stay, #2 Proposed Order To Exceed Page Limit)(Winton, James)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 IT IS ORDERED that all proceedings in these cases remain STAYED WITHOUTPREJUDICE for another ninety (90) days. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
April 2, 2018 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Status Conference and Miscellaneous Hearing held on 4/2/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik)(dl)
April 2, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelsey L. Warren on behalf of Christopher Frost, Steven Schwartz. Attorney Kelsey L. Warren added to party Christopher Frost(pty:dft), Attorney Kelsey L. Warren added to party Steven Schwartz(pty:dft) (Warren, Kelsey)
April 2, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Palmer Hooper on behalf of Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. Attorney Rachel Palmer Hooper added to party Peaktastic Beverage, LLC(pty:dft) (Hooper, Rachel)
March 30, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tressie E. McKeon on behalf of Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC. Attorney Tressie E. McKeon added to party Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tressie E. McKeon added to party Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC(pty:dft) (McKeon, Tressie)
March 29, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION to Lift Stay by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Thomas, John)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING #55 Motion to Continue Status Conference reset for 4/2/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dl)
March 8, 2018 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference and Request for Expedited Ruling by County of McLennan, Abelino Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henninger, Stephen)
March 7, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold J. Liller on behalf of Christopher Frost, Steven Schwartz (Liller, Harold)
March 7, 2018 Notice of Correction: re #53 Notice of Appearance. PLEASE DISREGAD. Document was filed in wrong case. Correction to be made. (dm)
March 7, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold J. Liller on behalf of Christopher Frost, Steven Schwartz. Attorney Harold J. Liller added to party Christopher Frost(pty:dft), Attorney Harold J. Liller added to party Steven Schwartz(pty:dft) (Liller, Harold)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 3/15/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks,). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
August 11, 2017 Filing 51 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO PLEAD by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Mengis, Michael)
August 9, 2017 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. Robert Lanning served on 6/30/2017, answer due 7/21/2017. (Coon, Brent)
August 9, 2017 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. Jeffrey Rogers served on 6/30/2017, answer due 7/21/2017. (Coon, Brent)
August 9, 2017 Filing 48 Joint MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS TO CLARIFY THE STAY by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mengis, Michael)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 IT IS ORDERED that all proceedings in these civil actions are STAYED WITHOUT PREJUDICE until March 15, 2018.. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
June 27, 2017 Filing 45 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coon, Brent)
June 26, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Frost, Steven Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lindsey, Christopher)
June 22, 2017 Filing 43 STIPULATION Extending Time to Plead by Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC. (Rumac, Michael)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
June 16, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss by Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna. (Brandt, Thomas)
June 16, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss by County of McLennan, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna. (Brandt, Thomas)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Amended Complaint; Peaktastic Beverage, LLC answer due 8/11/2017. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
June 14, 2017 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, #16 Joint MOTION to Stay Case , #15 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coon, Brent)
June 12, 2017 Filing 37 STIPULATION/MOTION EXTENDING TIME TO PLEAD by Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. (Mengis, Michael) Modified on 6/12/2017 to create motion (dm).
June 9, 2017 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. Christopher Frost served on 6/5/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Coon, Brent)
June 9, 2017 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. Steven Schwartz served on 6/5/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Coon, Brent)
June 9, 2017 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC served on 6/5/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Coon, Brent)
June 9, 2017 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC served on 6/5/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Coon, Brent)
June 8, 2017 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Status Conference held on 6/8/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(dm)
June 7, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Warren Mengis on behalf of Peaktastic Beverage, LLC (Mengis, Michael)
June 7, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C. Winton on behalf of Peaktastic Beverage, LLC. Attorney Michael Warren Mengis added to party Peaktastic Beverage, LLC(pty:dft) (Mengis, Michael) Modified on 6/7/2017 to correct text (dm).
June 2, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent W. Coon on behalf of Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King (Coon, Brent)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 6/8/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks,). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
May 31, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Phillip Brandt on behalf of County of McLennan, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna (Brandt, Thomas)
May 31, 2017 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. County of McLennan served on 5/22/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Coon, Brent)
May 31, 2017 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. MCLENNAN CO. SHERIFF (Coon, Brent)
May 31, 2017 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. John Does served on 5/22/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Coon, Brent)
May 31, 2017 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. Walter H. Peterson served on 5/22/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Coon, Brent)
May 31, 2017 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. (Coon, Brent)
May 31, 2017 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. Abelino Reyna served on 5/22/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Coon, Brent)
May 31, 2017 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Juan Carlos Garcia, Drew King. Peaktastic Beverage, LLC served on 5/22/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Coon, Brent)
May 31, 2017 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC. (dm)
May 31, 2017 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King. (Coon, Brent)
May 30, 2017 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, Robert Lanning, Jeffrey Rogers, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dixon, Michael)
May 30, 2017 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, County of McLennan, Robert Lanning, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna, Jeffrey Rogers, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D-3, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dixon, Michael)
May 30, 2017 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, County of McLennan, Robert Lanning, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna, Jeffrey Rogers, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D-2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dixon, Michael)
May 25, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Albert Harris. City of Waco served on 5/22/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Coon, Brent)
May 25, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Albert Harris. Manuel Chavez served on 5/20/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Coon, Brent)
May 24, 2017 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Albert Harris. Patrick Swanton served on 5/20/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Coon, Brent)
May 24, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Albert Harris. Brent Stroman served on 5/20/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Coon, Brent)
May 23, 2017 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to John Does. (dm)
May 23, 2017 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jim Albert Harris. (Coon, Brent)
May 19, 2017 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, County of McLennan, Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Peaktastic Beverage, LLC, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton, Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC. (dm)
May 18, 2017 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jim Albert Harris. (Coon, Brent)
May 17, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Christopher Frost, Robert Lanning, Jeffrey Rogers, Steven Schwartz. (dm)
May 17, 2017 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, County of McLennan, John Does, Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Peaktastic Beverage, LLC, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton, Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC, Robert Lanning, Jeffrey Rogers, Steven Schwartz, Christopher Frost amending #1 Complaint, filed by Juan Carlos Garcia, Bonar Crump, Jr, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King.(dm)
May 9, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Manuel Chavez, City of Waco, County of McLennan, John Does, Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC, Peaktastic Beverage, LLC, Walter H. Peterson, Abelino Reyna, Brent Stroman, Patrick Swanton, Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC. (afd)
May 8, 2017 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bonar Crump, Jr, Juan Carlos Garcia, Jim Albert Harris, Drew King. (afd)
May 8, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
May 8, 2017 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by JIM ALBERT HARRIS. (Coon, Brent)
May 8, 2017 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by JIM ALBERT HARRIS. (Coon, Brent)
May 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9564341), filed by JIM ALBERT HARRIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet)(Coon, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Chavez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonar Crump, Jr.
Represented By: Brent W. Coon
Represented By: Roger E. Topham
Represented By: John R. Thomas
Represented By: Don Tittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Albert Harris
Represented By: Brent W. Coon
Represented By: Roger E. Topham
Represented By: John R. Thomas
Represented By: Don Tittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Garcia
Represented By: Brent W. Coon
Represented By: Roger E. Topham
Represented By: John R. Thomas
Represented By: Don Tittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew King
Represented By: Brent W. Coon
Represented By: Roger E. Topham
Represented By: John R. Thomas
Represented By: Don Tittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of McLennan
Represented By: Stephen D Henninger
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter H. Peterson
Represented By: Stephen D Henninger
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peaktastic Beverage, LLC
Represented By: Michael Warren Mengis
Represented By: Rachel Palmer Hooper
Represented By: James C. Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Chavez
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Waco
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Brent Stroman
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Investment Company LLC
Represented By: Michael Steven Rumac
Represented By: Tressie E. McKeon
Represented By: Brett L. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Front Burner Restaurants GP, LLC
Represented By: Michael Steven Rumac
Represented By: Tressie E. McKeon
Represented By: Brett L. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abelino Reyna
Represented By: Stephen D Henninger
Represented By: Thomas Phillip Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Swanton
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Frost
Represented By: Kelsey L. Warren
Represented By: Christopher L. Lindsey
Represented By: Harold J. Liller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Det. Jeffrey Rogers
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Schwartz
Represented By: Kelsey L. Warren
Represented By: Christopher L. Lindsey
Represented By: Harold J. Liller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lanning
Represented By: Michael W. Dixon
Represented By: Charles D. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peaktastic Beverage, LLC doing business as Twin Peaks Restaurant
Represented By: Michael Warren Mengis
Represented By: Rachel Palmer Hooper
Represented By: James C. Winton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?