ESW Capital LLC v. Skoczkowski
Plaintiff: ESW Capital LLC and ESW Capital, LLC
Defendant: Lucas Skoczkowski
Case Number: 1:2017cv00857
Filed: September 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 34 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #26 Report and Recommendations, #13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lucas Skoczkowski. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
April 11, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objections to the Report and Recommendation of US Magistrate Judge to #31 Response by Lucas Skoczkowski. (Orozco, Christian)
April 4, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #29 Objection to Report and Recommendations by ESW Capital, LLC. (Mitby, Steven)
April 4, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objections to the Report and Recommendation of US Magistrate Judge to #28 Response by Lucas Skoczkowski. (Orozco, Christian)
March 21, 2018 Filing 29 OBJECTION to #26 Report and Recommendations of US Magistrate by Lucas Skoczkowski.. (Orozco, Christian)
March 21, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #26 Report and Recommendations by ESW Capital, LLC. (Mitby, Steven)
March 20, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian Alfonso Orozco on behalf of Lucas Skoczkowski. Attorney Christian Alfonso Orozco added to party Lucas Skoczkowski(pty:dft) (Orozco, Christian)
March 7, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #13 MOTION to Dismiss. (td)
March 7, 2018 Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lucas Skoczkowski. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lucas Skoczkowski. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (td)
October 18, 2017 Notice of Correction: re #24 Response to Motion. Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td)
October 17, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Lucas Skoczkowski, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Lucas Skoczkowski (Cox, John) Modified on 10/18/2017 to correct event (td).
October 10, 2017 Filing 23 ATTACHMENT to #20 Response to Motion,, by ESW Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-3 to Brighton Decl.)(Mitby, Steven)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response, extended to October 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
October 5, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lucas Skoczkowski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, John)
October 3, 2017 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by ESW Capital, LLC, re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff ESW Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit B-2, #7 Exhibit B-3, #8 Exhibit B-4, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit C-1, #11 Exhibit C-2, #12 Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit H, #17 Exhibit I, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Exhibit K, #20 Exhibit L, #21 Exhibit M, #22 Exhibit N, #23 Proposed Order)(Mitby, Steven) Modified on 10/4/2017 to amend text (td).
October 3, 2017 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lucas Skoczkowski amending, filed by ESW Capital, LLC.(Mitby, Steven)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 14, 2017 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ESW Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitby, Steven)
September 14, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J. Mitby on behalf of ESW Capital, LLC. Attorney Steven J. Mitby added to party ESW Capital, LLC(pty:pla) (Mitby, Steven)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andres Correa. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Weining Bai. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 12, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lucas Skoczkowski. (Cox, John)
September 12, 2017 Filing 12 ***DISREGARD SENT IN ERROR***Letter/Correspondence to Andres Correa re: non-admission status. (td) Modified on 9/12/2017 (td).
September 8, 2017 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Lucas Skoczkowski. (Cox, John)
September 6, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amir H. Alavi for Weining Bai ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9949872) by on behalf of ESW Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alavi, Amir)
September 6, 2017 Filing 9 Letter/Correspondence to Weining Bai regarding non-admitted status. (am2)
September 6, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of ESW Capital LLC (Alavi, Amir)
September 5, 2017 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ESW Capital LLC. (am2)
September 5, 2017 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Lucas Skoczkowski. (Cox, John)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (am2)
September 5, 2017 Filing 5 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Deficiency Notice to John Cox re #3 Supplement (am2)
September 5, 2017 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to JS44 Civil Cover Sheet #1 Notice of Removal by Lucas Skoczkowski. (Cox, John) Modified text on 9/5/2017; flattened document on 9/5/2017 (am2).
September 5, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am2)
September 5, 2017 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Lucas Skoczkowski. (Cox, John)
September 5, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andres Correa ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9944067) by on behalf of Lucas Skoczkowski. (Cox, John) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten document on 9/5/2017) (am2). Modified on 9/12/2017 to correct text(td).
September 5, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lucas Skoczkowski (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9943741), filed by Lucas Skoczkowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, John) (Attachment 1 was flattened and replaced on 9/8/2017) (am2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESW Capital LLC v. Skoczkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESW Capital LLC
Represented By: Weining Bai
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESW Capital, LLC
Represented By: Weining Bai
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Represented By: Steven J. Mitby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Skoczkowski
Represented By: Andres Correa
Represented By: John Thomas Cox, III
Represented By: Christian Alfonso Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?