Horizon Pharma, Inc. et al v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Horizon Pharma, Inc. and Pozen Inc.
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Lupin Ltd., Mylan Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Petitioner: Stephen M. Hash and Baker Botts LLP
Case Number: 1:2017cv00997
Filed: October 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in District of New Jersey as case number 2:17-cv-11635, filed 11/15/2017. (td)
November 15, 2017 Motions No Longer Referred: #1 MOTION to Quash. (td)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that Opposed, Non-Party Stephen M. Hash and Baker Botts L.L.P. Motion to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, Motion for a Protective Order (Dkt. #1 ) is HEREBY TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
November 6, 2017 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Baker Botts LLP, Stephen M. Hash, re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Baker Botts LLP, Movant Stephen M. Hash (Hash, Stephen)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Mark Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ah)
November 3, 2017 Filing 9 Letter/Correspondence to Dmitry V. Shelhoff re: non-admitted status. (td)
November 3, 2017 Filing 8 Letter/Correspondence to Stuart D. Sender re: non-admitted status. (td)
November 3, 2017 Filing 7 Letter/Correspondence to Alan H. Pollack re: non-admitted status. (td)
November 2, 2017 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Proposed Order) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
November 2, 2017 Please note that this case has been converted from a Miscellaneous case to a Civil case. Please use case number 1:17-cv-997-LY on all future filings, either electronic or paper. (td)
November 1, 2017 Filing 5 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Baker Botts LLP, Movant Stephen M. Hash Or, in the Alternative, Motion for a Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2017: #4 Sealed Exhibits) (td).
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Mark Lane. The deadline for the response is extended to November 1, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ah)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Baker Botts LLP, Stephen M. Hash. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (td)
October 24, 2017 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION to Quash by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie)
October 24, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh on behalf of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.. Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.(pty:res), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Terhune Arbaugh added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.(pty:res) (Arbaugh, Natalie)
October 18, 2017 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas or, in the alternative, Motion for a Protective Order ($47.00 Filing Fee, Receipt Number 100031530) by Baker Botts LLP, Stephen M. Hash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Stephen M. Hash, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt No. 100031530)(afd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horizon Pharma, Inc. et al v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.
Represented By: Natalie Terhune Arbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Terhune Arbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen M. Hash
Represented By: Stephen M. Hash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Baker Botts LLP
Represented By: Stephen M. Hash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pozen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?