Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO v. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company et al

Plaintiff: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Defendant: DIRECTV LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. and Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv01221
Filed: December 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 NOTICE OF APPEAL following #21 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0542-11278793. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (dl)
September 27, 2018 Filing 21 Appeal of Final Judgment #19 , #20 by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-11278793) (Van Os, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 20 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #15 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
August 28, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Gerald Holder on behalf of Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. Attorney Matthew Gerald Holder added to party Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO(pty:pla) (Holder, Matthew)
July 6, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #16 Objection to Report and Recommendations by AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV LLC, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Bourgeacq, Christian)
June 26, 2018 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #15 Report and Recommendations Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO.. (Van Os, David)
June 12, 2018 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by DIRECTV LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
March 8, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV LLC, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, re #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant DIRECTV LLC, Defendant AT&T Services, Inc., Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Robert Zurovec, #2 Exhibit Zurovec Exhibit H)(Bourgeacq, Christian)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DIRECTV LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Southwestern Bell Telephone Company and #11 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Joint Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or Alternative Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
March 2, 2018 Filing 12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, re #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant DIRECTV LLC, Defendant AT&T Services, Inc., Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company Plaintiff's Appendix (Van Os, David)
March 2, 2018 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO, re #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant DIRECTV LLC, Defendant AT&T Services, Inc., Defendant Southwestern Bell Telephone Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cummings Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Affidavit, #14 Affidavit, #15 Affidavit)(Van Os, David)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Deadline to respond is extended to 3/2/18. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
February 2, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Os, David)
January 26, 2018 Filing 8 Defendants' JOINT ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV LLC, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company.(Bourgeacq, Christian)
January 26, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV LLC, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert Zurovec, #3 Exhibit Zurovec Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Zurovec Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Zurovec Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Zurovec Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Zurovec Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Zurovec Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Zurovec Exhibit G)(Bourgeacq, Christian)
January 26, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV LLC, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (Bourgeacq, Christian)
January 3, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AT&T Services, Inc., DIRECTV LLC, Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. (afd)
January 3, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Van Os, David) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/3/2018 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/3/2018 to flatten image) (afd). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/3/2018 to flatten image) (afd).
December 30, 2017 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (cj)
December 30, 2017 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
December 30, 2017 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Van Os, David) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten document on 1/3/2018) (cj).
December 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10313441), filed by Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Os, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO v. Southwestern Bell Telephone Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David Van Os
Represented By: Matthew Gerald Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV LLC
Represented By: Christian A. Bourgeacq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christian A. Bourgeacq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Christian A. Bourgeacq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?