The Revocable Living Trust of Judith A. Dunn Dated December 16, 1996, Judith A. Dunn, Trustee v. Quicken Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Revocable Living Trust of Judith A. Dunn Dated December 16, 1996 Judith A. Dunn, Trustee
Defendant: Wendy Alexander, Quicken Loans, Inc., Ranene C. Smith and Edwin A. Smith, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv00371
Filed: May 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AGREED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that this case is STAYED until 09/18/2020. The parties shall file dismissal papers or a joint status report on or before 9/18/2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Revocable Living Trust of Judith A. Dunn Dated December 16, 1996, Judith A. Dunn, Trustee v. Quicken Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranene C. Smith
Represented By: Curtis J. Kurhajec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin A. Smith, III
Represented By: Curtis J. Kurhajec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Revocable Living Trust of Judith A. Dunn Dated December 16, 1996 Judith A. Dunn, Trustee
Represented By: Charley L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?