Williams, Jr. v. Seton Family of Hospitals et al

Plaintiff: Leon Williams, Jr.
Defendant: Seton Family of Hospitals and Jason A. Bradley, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00593
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1395dd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Seton Family of Hospitals, re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Puig, Yvonne)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition filed by Seton Family of Hospitals. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
August 20, 2018 Filing 21 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Leon Williams, Jr, re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Onstad, Rockne)
August 17, 2018 Filing 20 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Puig, Yvonne)
August 17, 2018 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Amended Petition by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Puig, Yvonne)
August 15, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #15 Reply to Response to Motion by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Puig, Yvonne)
August 15, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Jason A. Bradley, M.D., re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Jason A. Bradley, M.D. (Hale, Paula)
August 15, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jason A. Bradley, M.D., re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Jason A. Bradley, M.D. (Hale, Paula)
August 14, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Leon Williams, Jr, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Onstad, Rockne)
August 14, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Seton Family of Hospitals, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Puig, Yvonne)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jason A. Bradley, M.D., #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Seton Family of Hospitals. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
August 8, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Leon Williams, Jr, re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Jason A. Bradley, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Onstad, Rockne)
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Leon Williams, Jr, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Seton Family of Hospitals (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Onstad, Rockne)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jason A. Bradley, M.D.. (Hale, Paula)
August 6, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Leon Williams, Jr.(Onstad, Rockne) Modified on 8/6/2018 (lt).
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Seton Family of Hospitals. (Puig, Yvonne)
July 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon Williams, Jr. Jason A. Bradley, M.D. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Onstad, Rockne)
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leon Williams, Jr. All Defendants. (Onstad, Rockne)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jason A. Bradley, M.D.. (dl)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Seton Family of Hospitals. (dl)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Leon Williams, Jr. (Onstad, Rockne)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Leon Williams, Jr. (Onstad, Rockne)
July 16, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leon Williams, Jr. (cj)
July 16, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11011103), filed by Leon Williams, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Onstad, Rockne) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 7/16/2018) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Jr. v. Seton Family of Hospitals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seton Family of Hospitals
Represented By: Yvonne K. Puig
Represented By: Daphne Marie Andritsos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason A. Bradley, M.D.
Represented By: Joel J. Steed
Represented By: Paula K. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Rockne W. Onstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?