Haule v. Grassroots Leadership
Plaintiff: Margaret Haule
Defendant: Grassroots Leadership
Case Number: 1:2018cv00606
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew W Austin
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Haule is ORDERED to file by September 15, 2018 a More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing, Request for Alternative Dispute Resolution by Margaret Haule. (dm)
July 19, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
July 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Margaret Haule.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Margaret Haule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haule v. Grassroots Leadership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grassroots Leadership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Haule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?