Defense Distributed et al v. Grewal et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation seek declaratory and injunctive relief that their publication of computer-aided design and computer-numeric control files for printable guns on the Internet are protected by the First and Second Amendment of the U.S. Constitution, as well as the Supremacy Clause pursuant to a U.S. State Department license.

Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. and Defense Distributed
Defendant: Gurbir S. Grewal, Michael Feuer, Matthew Denn, Andrew Cuomo, Thomas Wolf and Josh Shapiro
Case Number: 1:2018cv00637
Filed: July 29, 2018
Court: Texas Western District Court
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed as to Andrew Cuomo. Waiver sent on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Flores, Charles)
October 19, 2018 47 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion by Kenneth W. Taber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
October 19, 2018 46 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Low, Ronald)
October 19, 2018 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Casey Low for Kenneth Taber (Filing fee $100 receipt number 0542-11362025) by on behalf of Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Low, Ronald)
October 18, 2018 44 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion by John D. Kimball to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
October 18, 2018 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Casey Low on behalf of Gurbir S. Grewal. Attorney Ronald Casey Low added to party Gurbir S. Grewal(pty:dft) (Low, Ronald)
October 17, 2018 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. Replaces document 40 #40 Certificate of Service (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. of Michael Feuer (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. of Los Angeles City Attorney (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed as to Josh Shapiro. Waiver sent on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018; Thomas Wolf. Waiver sent on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (Flores, Charles)
October 16, 2018 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed as to Matthew Denn. Waiver sent on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Flores, Charles)
October 15, 2018 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. David Cabello , [John D. Kimball-Blank Rome LLP], ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11341013) by on behalf of Josh Shapiro, Thomas Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Motion Pro Hac Vice [John D. Kimball-Blank Rome LLP])(Cabello, J.)
October 15, 2018 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. David Cabello on behalf of Josh Shapiro, Thomas Wolf. Attorney J. David Cabello added to party Josh Shapiro(pty:dft), Attorney J. David Cabello added to party Thomas Wolf(pty:dft) (Cabello, J.)
September 28, 2018 35 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Flores, Charles)
September 25, 2018 34 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion by Connie K. Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 25, 2018 33 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion by James P. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 25, 2018 32 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion by Michael M. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 25, 2018 31 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #29 & #30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 19, 2018 30 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
September 19, 2018 29 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
September 17, 2018 28 MOTION Michael Feuer's Request for Judicial Notice re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), and Texas Civil Practice & Remedies Code Sec. 27.003 by Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 27 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), and Texas Civil Practice & Remedies Code Sec. 27.003 by Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason P. Steed for Connie K. Chan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11237635) by on behalf of Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason P. Steed for James P. Clark ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11237600) by on behalf of Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason P. Steed for Michael M. Walsh ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11237340) by on behalf of Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint,., filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Raffetto, Mary)
September 14, 2018 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. as to Gurbir S. Grewal. Waiver sent on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 11, 2018 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. Service of Michael Feuer In his capacity of LA City Attorney (Goldstein, Matthew)
September 11, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion by Matthew A. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 11, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion by Charles R. Flores to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 11, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion by Daniel N. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
August 29, 2018 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. Corrected Certificate of Service for #3 Notice of Appearance, (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 24, 2018 16 Summons Issued as to Michael Feuer. (td)
August 23, 2018 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 23, 2018 14 Summons Issued as to Michael Feuer. (td)
August 22, 2018 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Matthew Goldstein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11135901) by on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Kathryn Raffetto of Charles R. Flores ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11134380) by on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order-Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles R. Flores)(Raffetto, Mary)
August 17, 2018 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Kathryn Raffetto for Daniel N. Hammond ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11134307) by on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel N., Hammond)(Raffetto, Mary)
August 17, 2018 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Kathryn Raffetto on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Attorney Mary Kathryn Raffetto added to party Defense Distributed(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Kathryn Raffetto added to party Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.(pty:pla) (Raffetto, Mary)
August 17, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to Michael Feuer, Gurbir S. Grewal. (td)
August 17, 2018 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Jonathan F. Mitchell: re #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. (td)
August 16, 2018 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
July 31, 2018 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Jonathan F. Mitchell: re #3 Notice of Appearance. (td)
July 30, 2018 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Defense Distributed(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.(pty:pla) (Mitchell, Jonathan)
July 30, 2018 2 Letter to Alan Gura re: Non-Admitted Status.(afd)
July 29, 2018 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (afd)
July 29, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
July 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11059998). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Blackman, Joshua) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2018 to flatten image) (afd).
July 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11059998). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Blackman, Joshua) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2018 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defense Distributed et al v. Grewal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Michael Blackman
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Raffetto
Represented By: Daniel N. Hammond
Represented By: Charles R. Flores
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defense Distributed
Represented By: Joshua Michael Blackman
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Raffetto
Represented By: Daniel N. Hammond
Represented By: Charles R. Flores
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurbir S. Grewal
Represented By: Kenneth W. Taber
Represented By: Ronald Casey Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Feuer
Represented By: Jason P. Steed
Represented By: Michael M. Walsh
Represented By: James P. Clark
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Denn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wolf
Represented By: John D. Kimball
Represented By: J. David Cabello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: John D. Kimball
Represented By: J. David Cabello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?