Inmobiliaria Buda, S. De R.L. De C.V. et al v. Emerald FL, LLC et al
Plaintiff: INMOBILIARIA BUDA, S. DE R.L. DE C.V. and INMOBILIARIA DONA LUCHA, S. DE R.L. DE CV
Defendant: OESK, LLC, Emerald FL, LLC, CLAUDIA IRENE RUIZ MAZARIEGOS, SANTIAGO SOLORZANO URETA, MARICELA NAVA ARZATE and ROBERTO APARICIO MORENO
Case Number: 1:2018cv00639
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Francis N. Scollan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant OESK, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Francis N. Scollan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. O'Dens ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11164668) by on behalf of OESK, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(O'Dens, David) Modified on 8/27/2018 (lt).
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so.Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 30, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by OESK, LLC. (O'Dens, David)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OESK, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11063365), filed by OESK, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Dens, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2018: #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inmobiliaria Buda, S. De R.L. De C.V. et al v. Emerald FL, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OESK, LLC
Represented By: David M. O'Dens
Represented By: Francis N. Scollan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald FL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUDIA IRENE RUIZ MAZARIEGOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTIAGO SOLORZANO URETA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARICELA NAVA ARZATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERTO APARICIO MORENO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INMOBILIARIA BUDA, S. DE R.L. DE C.V.
Represented By: Jerry Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INMOBILIARIA DONA LUCHA, S. DE R.L. DE CV
Represented By: Jerry Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?