DAV Sub, Inc v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: DAV Sub, Inc.
Defendant: Elizabeth M. Brown and Planet Hope LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00669
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Elizabeth M. Brown.(Cleveland, Timothy)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Elizabeth M. Brown answer due 9/18/2018; Planet Hope LLC answer due 9/18/2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Elizabeth M. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cleveland, Timothy)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAV Sub, Inc.. Planet Hope LLC served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Weiss, Jesse)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAV Sub, Inc.. Elizabeth M. Brown served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Weiss, Jesse)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Elizabeth M. Brown, Planet Hope LLC. (cj)
August 9, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DAV Sub, Inc. (Weiss, Jesse)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DAV Sub, Inc. (Weiss, Jesse)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11102866). No Summons requested at this time, filed by DAV Sub, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiss, Jesse) (Attachment 3 replaced and flattened on 8/9/2018) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAV Sub, Inc v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth M. Brown
Represented By: Matthew Murrell
Represented By: Timothy Cleveland
Represented By: Kevin James Terrazas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Hope LLC
Represented By: Matthew Murrell
Represented By: Timothy Cleveland
Represented By: Kevin James Terrazas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAV Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T. Shelton
Represented By: Jesse Zachary Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?