Richards et al v. Oldcastle Materials, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Richards, Randall Richards and Randall G. Richards
Defendant: Capital Metro Transportation Authority, Austin Western Railroad, Wheeler Companies, Ergon, Inc., Oldcastle Materials, Inc., WATCO Companies LLC., Ironhorse Asphalt-APAC Texas and Ergon Asphalt & Emulsions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00697
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #18 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Austin Western Railroad, WATCO Companies LLC. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Modifying Style. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleading and Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ironhorse Asphalt-APAC Texas answer due 10/12/2018; Oldcastle Materials, Inc. answer due 10/12/2018; Wheeler Companies answer due 10/12/2018. (td)
September 27, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Petition by Capital Metro Transportation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Stratton, C.)
September 27, 2018 Filing 20 Defendants Original ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ergon Asphalt & Emulsions, Inc., Ergon, Inc..(Sanders, Bret)
September 27, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Petition by Ironhorse Asphalt-APAC Texas, Oldcastle Materials, Inc., Wheeler Companies. (Boyce, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Claims Against by Austin Western Railroad, WATCO Companies LLC.. (Kaufmann, Lisa)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition by Ironhorse Asphalt-APAC Texas, Oldcastle Materials, Inc., Wheeler Companies. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyce, David)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Randall G. Richards. (td)
September 13, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Austin Western Railroad, Capital Metro Transportation Authority, Ergon Asphalt & Emulsions, Inc., Ergon, Inc., Ironhorse Asphalt-APAC Texas, Oldcastle Materials, Inc., Wheeler Companies amending, filed by Victoria Richards, Randall G. Richards.(td)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Austin Western Railroad, WATCO Companies LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufmann, Lisa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Capital Metro Transportation Authority. (Stratton, C.)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion by Brent A. Talbot to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Austin Western Railroad, WATCO Companies LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufmann, Lisa)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE Consent to Removal of Defendants by Ergon Asphalt & Emulsions, Inc., Ergon, Inc.. (Sanders, Bret)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Marie Kaufmann For Brent A. Talbot ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11144570) by on behalf of Austin Western Railroad, WATCO Companies LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufmann, Lisa)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so.Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet by Austin Western Railroad, WATCO Companies LLC.. (Kaufmann, Lisa)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 RESPONSE Consent to #1 Notice of Removal, by Ironhorse Asphalt-APAC Texas, Oldcastle Materials, Inc., Wheeler Companies. (Boyce, David)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Capital Metro Transportation Authority. (Stratton, C.)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Austin Western Railroad, WATCO Companies, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11133775), filed by Austin Western Railroad, WATCO Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufmann, Lisa)
August 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
August 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ergon Asphalt & Emulsions, Inc., Ergon, Inc., Ironhorse Asphalt-APAC Texas, Oldcastle Materials, Inc., Randall Richards, Victoria Richards, Wheeler Companies. (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards et al v. Oldcastle Materials, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Metro Transportation Authority
Represented By: Erik Michael Weber
Represented By: C. Mark Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Western Railroad
Represented By: Lisa Marie Kaufmann
Represented By: Brent A. Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler Companies
Represented By: David P. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergon, Inc.
Represented By: Bret Allan Sanders
Represented By: Gregory McClellan Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oldcastle Materials, Inc.
Represented By: David P. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATCO Companies LLC.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Kaufmann
Represented By: Brent A. Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironhorse Asphalt-APAC Texas
Represented By: David P. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergon Asphalt & Emulsions, Inc.
Represented By: Bret Allan Sanders
Represented By: Gregory McClellan Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall G. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?