Mughal v. Emirates

Plaintiff: Balqees Akhtar Mughal
Defendant: Emirates
Case Number: 1:2018cv00717
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Balqees Akhtar Mughal as to Emirates. Waiver sent on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Sanger, Ladd)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Emirates. (td)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Balqees Akhtar Mughal. (Sanger, Ladd)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Balqees Akhtar Mughal. (Sanger, Ladd)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Abram I. Bohrer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION by Abram I. Bohrer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11153490) on behalf of Balqees Akhtar Mughal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sanger, Ladd) Modified on 8/23/2018 (td).
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Letter to Abram Bohrer re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd)
August 22, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Balqees Akhtar Mughal. (afd)
August 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11147759), filed by Balqees Akhtar Mughal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanger, Ladd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mughal v. Emirates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balqees Akhtar Mughal
Represented By: Ladd Charles Sanger
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Represented By: Abram I. Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emirates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?