Vista Health Plan, Inc. et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Vista Service Corporation and Vista Health Plan, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II, Seema Verma, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv00824
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE (Joint) by Alex M. Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma re #5 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Powers, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James R. Powers on behalf of Alex M. Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma. Attorney James R. Powers added to party Alex M. Azar, II(pty:dft), Attorney James R. Powers added to party Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services(pty:dft), Attorney James R. Powers added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney James R. Powers added to party Seema Verma(pty:dft) (Powers, James)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Vista Health Plan, Inc., Vista Service Corporation. (Riggs, Jennifer)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Seema Verma. (lt)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Vista Health Plan, Inc., Vista Service Corporation. (Riggs, Jennifer)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Vista Health Plan, Inc., Vista Service Corporation. (Riggs, Jennifer) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 10/1/2018) (cj).
September 28, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Complaint v. US HHS et al. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11285132). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Vista Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit 2018 9 28 Verification of P Tovar ISO Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 ISO Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 ISO Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 ISO Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 ISO Complaint, #6 Proposed Order 2018 9 28 Proposed TRO)(Riggs, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vista Health Plan, Inc. et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: James R. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Service Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Scott Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Scott Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?