ARX Fit, LLC v. Outstrip Equipment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ARX Fit, LLC
Defendant: Outstrip Equipment, LLC, Crazy Train, LLC, Randy Rindfleisch, Round to Fit, LLC, Ariel Huskins and Full Throttle Fitness Concepts, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00848
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 26 Pro Hac Vice Letters to John P. Fredrickson and Michael T. Griggs. (afd)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Plaintiff's deadlines to respond to each pending motion to dismiss are extended to and include December 18, 2018. Defendants' reply deadlines are each extended to and include January 4, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
November 30, 2018 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by ARX Fit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines)(Ghavimi, Darlene)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion by William J. Brinkerhoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion by Hannah Kaufman Joseph to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion by Alexandra J. Blackwell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
November 27, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case by Ariel Huskins, Outstrip Equipment, LLC, Round to Fit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ariel Huskins, #2 Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order on Motion to Transfer Venue)(Taube, Eric)
November 27, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Taube for Hannah Kaufman Joseph ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11493546) by on behalf of Ariel Huskins, Outstrip Equipment, LLC, Round to Fit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taube, Eric)
November 27, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Taube for William J. Brinkerhoff ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11493529) by on behalf of Ariel Huskins, Outstrip Equipment, LLC, Round to Fit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taube, Eric)
November 27, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric J. Taube for Alexandra J. Blackwell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11493440) by on behalf of Ariel Huskins, Outstrip Equipment, LLC, Round to Fit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taube, Eric)
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Full Throttle, For a More Definite Statement and To Strike Plaintiff's Request for Statutory Damages and Attorneys Fees on Its Copyright Infringement Claim by Crazy Train, LLC, Full Throttle Fitness Concepts, LLC, Randy Rindfleisch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(Shaw, Ethan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ARX Fit, LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Rindfleisch Return, #2 Crazy Train Return, #3 Full Throttle Return, #4 Outstrip Equip. Return, #5 Round To Fit Return)(Ghavimi, Darlene)
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Round to Fit, LLC. (td)
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Outstrip Equipment, LLC. (td)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Crazy Train, LLC. (td)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Ariel Huskins. (td)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Full Throttle Fitness Concepts, LLC. (td)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Randy Rindfleisch. (td)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARX Fit, LLC. to Round to Fit LLC (Ghavimi, Darlene)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARX Fit, LLC. to Outstrip Equipment LLC (Ghavimi, Darlene)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARX Fit, LLC. to Ariel Huskins (Ghavimi, Darlene)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARX Fit, LLC. to Crazy Train LLC (Ghavimi, Darlene)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARX Fit, LLC. to Full Throttle Fitness Concepts (Ghavimi, Darlene)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ARX Fit, LLC. to Randy Rindfleisch (Ghavimi, Darlene)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Pogorzelski on behalf of ARX Fit, LLC (Pogorzelski, Henry)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj)
October 5, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ARX Fit, LLC. (cj)
October 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11313236). No Summons requested at this time, filed by ARX Fit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ghavimi, Darlene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARX Fit, LLC v. Outstrip Equipment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARX Fit, LLC
Represented By: Henry Pogorzelski
Represented By: Darlene Ghavimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outstrip Equipment, LLC
Represented By: Kevin W. Brown
Represented By: Alexandra J. Blackwell
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Eric J. Taube
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crazy Train, LLC
Represented By: Ethan L. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Rindfleisch
Represented By: Ethan L. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Round to Fit, LLC
Represented By: Kevin W. Brown
Represented By: Alexandra J. Blackwell
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Eric J. Taube
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariel Huskins
Represented By: Kevin W. Brown
Represented By: Alexandra J. Blackwell
Represented By: William J. Brinkerhoff
Represented By: Eric J. Taube
Represented By: Hannah Kaufman Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Full Throttle Fitness Concepts, LLC
Represented By: Ethan L. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?