rateGenius Loan Services, Inc. v. Fleet Financial, Inc.
Plaintiff: rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.
Defendant: Fleet Financial, Inc., dba iLendingDirect, Inc. and Fleet Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00900
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 27 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
August 17, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Garrett, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Motions to Amend Pleadings/Join Parties due by 8/19/2019, Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 24 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Price, Ann)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings/Join Parties due by 7/19/2019, Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Price, Ann)
February 28, 2019 Filing 21 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Price, Ann)
February 28, 2019 Filing 20 ADR Report Filed - CONSENT to Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.(Price, Ann)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 2/28/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings/Join Parties due by 5/31/2019, Discovery due by 11/15/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2020, Jury Trial set for 5/4/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/7/2019. Written Order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(lt)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward L. Friedman on behalf of Fleet Financial, Inc. (Friedman, Edward)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Edward L. Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fleet Financial, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dennis P. Duffy for Edward Friedman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11720538) by on behalf of Fleet Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duffy, Dennis)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING Initial Pretrial Conference by phone for 2/7/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Price, Ann)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Price, Ann)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT Filed Jointly by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Price, Ann)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Price, Ann)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fleet Financial, Inc.. (Duffy, Dennis)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fleet Financial, Inc..(Duffy, Dennis)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Ann A. Price: re #1 Complaint (lt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fleet Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duffy, Dennis)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Defendant Fleet Financial's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants answer or other response to the Complaint is due on or before November 28, 2018. The Court notes that Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief is deficient under the Local Rules, (see Dkt. #6 ), and Defendant need not file a response to those claims at this time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
November 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fleet Financial, Inc. answer due 11/28/2018. (lt)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. Fleet Financial, Inc. served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (Price, Ann) Modified on 10/23/2018 to correct text (dm).
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fleet Financial, Inc.. (afd)
October 19, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
October 19, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (afd)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Price, Ann)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11365115), filed by rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Price, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: rateGenius Loan Services, Inc. v. Fleet Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: rateGenius Loan Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ann A. Price
Represented By: Steven H. Garrett
Represented By: Kristin Johnson Aldred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Financial, Inc., dba iLendingDirect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleet Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis P. Duffy
Represented By: Edward L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?