Talamantes v. The Becton Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Talamantes
Defendant: The Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, The Becton Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan and Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00904
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant Becton, Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Tiffany L. Cox added to party The Becton Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan(pty:dft) by The Becton Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan.(Cox, Tiffany)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #1 Complaint. The Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer due 1/7/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Linda)
December 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Standard Insurance Company answer due 1/7/2019 per waiver of service #4 . (lt)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Enrique Talamantes as to The Becton Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan. Waiver sent on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Roach, Lonnie)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Enrique Talamantes as to Standard Insurance Company. Waiver sent on 11/6/18/2018, answer due 1/07/19. (Roach, Lonnie) Modified on 12/10/2018 to correct dates (lt).
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Enrique Talamantes as to The Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Waiver sent on 10/22/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Roach, Lonnie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Enrique Talamantes. (Roach, Lonnie)
October 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11366951). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Enrique Talamantes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Roach, Lonnie) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/22/2018 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talamantes v. The Becton Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda G. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Becton Dickinson and Company Group Life and Health Plan
Represented By: Tiffany L. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Talamantes
Represented By: Lonnie Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?