Streek v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Plaintiff: Emma Vande Streek
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00914
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Gilbert Andrew Greene added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft) by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Greene, Gilbert)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emma Vande Streek. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Shaw, Ethan)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (afd)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Michael L. McGlamry. (afd)
October 24, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Emma Vande Streek. (afd)
October 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Amended Request for Issuance of Summons by Emma Vande Streek. (Shaw, Ethan) Modified on 10/25/2018 to correct document title (afd).
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11377974), filed by Emma Vande Streek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shaw, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streek v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Vande Streek
Represented By: Ethan L. Shaw
Represented By: John Paul Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert Andrew Greene
Represented By: Brad Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?