Kwiatkowski v. Hologic, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bethany Kwiatkowski
Defendant: Hologic, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00967
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bethany Kwiatkowski as to Hologic, Inc.. Waiver sent on 11/9/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Schmidt, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Hologic, Inc. c/o Registered Agent, CT Corporation, 1999 Bryan St #900, Dallas, TX 75201 on November 9, 2018 by Bethany Kwiatkowski (Schmidt, Robert)
November 8, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bethany Kwiatkowski. (cj)
November 8, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11439748). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Bethany Kwiatkowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmidt, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 11/9/2018) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwiatkowski v. Hologic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hologic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Kwiatkowski
Represented By: Robert Wayne Schmidt
Represented By: Joe K. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?