L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc. v. Drunk Elephant, LLC et al
Plaintiff: L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.
Defendant: Drunk Elephant, LLC and Drunk Elephant Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00982
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 18 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Drunk Elephant Holdings, LLC, Drunk Elephant, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ennis, Chad)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion by Joanna Lee Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion by Michelle Esther O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion by Jackson Robert Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion by Shauna Miller Wertheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc. as to Drunk Elephant, LLC. Waiver sent on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (Donnelly, Haakon)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc. as to Drunk Elephant Holdings, LLC. Waiver sent on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (Donnelly, Haakon)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Haakon T. Donnelly for Shauna Miller Wertheim ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11468097) by on behalf of L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donnelly, Haakon)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Haakon T. Donnelly for Jackson Robert Smith ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11468094) by on behalf of L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donnelly, Haakon)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Haakon T. Donnelly for Joanna Lee Cohn ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11467947) by on behalf of L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donnelly, Haakon)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Haakon T. Donnelly for Michelle Esther O'Brien ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11467896) by on behalf of L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Donnelly, Haakon)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Drunk Elephant Holdings, LLC, Drunk Elephant, LLC. (afd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (afd) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/15/2018 with dated form) (afd).
November 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.. to Drunk Elephant, LLC (Donnelly, Haakon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.. (Donnelly, Haakon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.. (Donnelly, Haakon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.. (Donnelly, Haakon)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11455455), filed by L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Donnelly, Haakon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc. v. Drunk Elephant, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drunk Elephant, LLC
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drunk Elephant Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Chad Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L'Oreal USA Creative, Inc.
Represented By: Haakon T. Donnelly
Represented By: Michelle E. O'Brien
Represented By: Joanna Lee Cohn
Represented By: Jackson Robert Smith
Represented By: Shauna Miller Wertheim
Represented By: Barbara L. Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?