Rosario v. Texas Veterans Commission
Plaintiff: Benjamin Rosario
Defendant: Texas Veterans Commission
Case Number: 1:2018cv01008
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Texas Veterans Commission. (Moreno, Cristina)
December 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Texas Veterans Commission answer due 1/18/2019. (td)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and includes January 18, 2019.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Texas Veterans Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moreno, Cristina)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Rosario. Texas Veterans Commission served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Sergi, David)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Rosario. Benjamin Rosario served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Sergi, David)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Texas Veterans Commission. (afd)
November 26, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Benjamin Rosario. (afd)
November 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons in a Civil Action by Benjamin Rosario. (Sergi, David) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/27/2018 to flatten image) (afd).
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11488064), filed by Benjamin Rosario. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Sergi, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosario v. Texas Veterans Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Veterans Commission
Represented By: Cristina M. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Rosario
Represented By: David K. Sergi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?