Sorber et al v. Security Walls, LLC

Plaintiff: Daniel Childers, Don Hart, Harold Dickerson, Jerry Head, Michelle Sorber, Moses SiFuentez, Johnny Johlke, Tony Hernandez, William Melton, Martha Moore, Howard Perry, Margret Melton, Zinmon Whitter and Armando Gonzalez
Defendant: Security Walls, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01088
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Security Walls, LLC.(td)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Security Walls, LLC by Daniel Childers, Harold Dickerson, Armando Gonzalez, Don Hart, Jerry Head, Tony Hernandez, Johnny Johlke, Margret Melton, William Melton, Martha Moore, Howard Perry, Moses SiFuentez, Michelle Sorber, Zinmon Whitter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bachop, Matthew)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint; Security Walls, LLC answer due 2/1/2019. ORDER that Milton D. Jones shall file a motion for pro hac vice on or before February 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Milton D. Jones. (td)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Security Walls, LLC. (td)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Melton, Armando Gonzalez, Daniel Childers, Margret Melton, Moses SiFuentez, Tony Hernandez, Jerry Head, Martha Moore, Zinmon Whitter, Michelle Sorber, Don Hart, Howard Perry, Johnny Johlke, Harold Dickerson. Security Walls, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Bachop, Matthew)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Security Walls, LLC. (cj)
December 14, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel Childers, Harold Dickerson, Armando Gonzalez, Don Hart, Jerry Head, Tony Hernandez, Johnny Johlke, Margret Melton, William Melton, Martha Moore, Howard Perry, Moses SiFuentez, Michelle Sorber, Zinmon Whitter. (cj)
December 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Daniel Childers, Harold Dickerson, Armando Gonzalez, Don Hart, Jerry Head, Tony Hernandez, Johnny Johlke, Margret Melton, William Melton, Martha Moore, Howard Perry, Moses SiFuentez, Michelle Sorber, Zinmon Whitter. (Bachop, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 12/14/2018) (cj).
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11559684), filed by William Melton, Armando Gonzalez, Daniel Childers, Margret Melton, Moses SiFuentez, Tony Hernandez, Jerry Head, Martha Moore, Zinmon Whitter, Michelle Sorber, Don Hart, Howard Perry, Johnny Johlke, Harold Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bachop, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorber et al v. Security Walls, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Childers
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Hart
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Dickerson
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Head
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sorber
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses SiFuentez
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Johlke
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Melton
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Moore
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Perry
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margret Melton
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zinmon Whitter
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Gonzalez
Represented By: Matthew B. Bachop
Represented By: Elaine Fawcett Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Walls, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?