Teague v. Williamson County et al

Plaintiff: Teague Mary and Officer Mary Teague
Defendant: Williamson County, City of Giddings and Travis County
Case Number: 1:2018cv01098
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mary Teague as to Williamson County. Waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Poerschke, Randall)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mary Teague as to Travis County. Waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Poerschke, Randall)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Giddings as to City of Giddings. Waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Dickie, Martha)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Williamson County, Travis County, City of Giddings. (lt)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mary Teague. (Poerschke, Randall)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion by Randall Scott Poerschke, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion by Chris J. Ainsworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Chris J. Ainsworth to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11575949) by on behalf of Mary Teague. (Essmyer, Michael) Modified on 12/20/2018 (td).
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Randall Scott Poerschke, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11575703) by on behalf of Mary Teague. (Essmyer, Michael) Modified on 12/20/2018 (td).
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Mary Teague. (Essmyer, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Complaint (afd)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letters to R. Scoot Poerschke and Chris J. Ainsworth. (afd)
December 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mary Teague. (afd)
December 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11565119). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Teague Mary.(Essmyer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague v. Williamson County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Giddings
Represented By: Martha Sue Dickie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teague Mary
Represented By: Michael M. Essmyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officer Mary Teague
Represented By: Michael M. Essmyer
Represented By: Randall Scott Poerschke, Jr.
Represented By: Chris Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?