Peterson v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Joseph Peterson
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv01102
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 Request for U.S. Marshals Service Expenses in Pauper Case - $44.64. (td)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Peterson. U.S. Attorney served on 12/26/2018. (td)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Peterson. United States Attorney General served on 12/28/2018. (td)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Peterson. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (td)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, filed by Joseph Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lt)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U.S. Marshal shall issue process upon the named defendant under Rules 4 and 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (lt)
December 18, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane.. Referral Judge: Mark Lane. (cj)
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Title II Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Skaar, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Peterson
Represented By: Daniel A. Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?