Direct Biologics, LLC v. Spiel
Plaintiff: Direct Biologics, LLC
Defendant: Douglas Spiel
Case Number: 1:2018cv01124
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Allen P. Press. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michelle L. Greenberg. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties by Direct Biologics, LLC. (Vacalis, John)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Vacalis on behalf of Allen P. Press ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11653280) by on behalf of Direct Biologics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vacalis, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett L. Myers on behalf of Michelle Lynn Greenberg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11646358) by on behalf of Douglas Spiel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Myers, Brett)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John P. Vacalis on behalf of Direct Biologics, LLC (Vacalis, John)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Douglas Spiel.(Myers, Brett)
January 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #3 Order Requiring Removing Party to Supplement with Documents filed in State Court by Douglas Spiel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Citation, #3 Exhibit Return of Citation, #4 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet)(Myers, Brett)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
December 27, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Direct Biologics, LLC. (afd)
December 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 APPENDIX to #1 Notice of Removal by Douglas Spiel. (Myers, Brett)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Douglas Spiel (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11591328), filed by Douglas Spiel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Myers, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Direct Biologics, LLC v. Spiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Spiel
Represented By: Brett L. Myers
Represented By: Michelle L. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Biologics, LLC
Represented By: John P. Vacalis
Represented By: Alexander T. Dimock
Represented By: Allen P. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?