UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Grande Communications Networks LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fonovisa, Inc., Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Arista Music, Zomba Recording LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Arista Records LLC, Warner Bros. Records Inc., Tooth & Nail, LLC, LaFace Records LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Capitol Christian Music Group, Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Capitol Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation and Nonesuch Records Inc.
Defendant: Grande Communication Networks LLC, Recording Industry Association of America, Inc. and Grande Communications Networks LLC
Respondent: Recording Industry Association of America
Case Number: 1:2018mc00613
Filed: July 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Motion to Compel
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-mc-00090.
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The #6 Motion is GRANTED; and 2) The case is TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Texas. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/16/2018. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Motion to Compel, Proposed Order, Disclosure Statement (Docket Nos. 1-3) (Service Date July 12, 2018) by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC. (Ross, David) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.]
July 10, 2018 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for Full Case Management. (zsth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING case to Magistrate Judge for full case management. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/10/2018. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Proposed Order by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC re #1 Motion to Compel (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 4616093436.) filed by GRANDE COMMUNICATION NETWORKS LLC.(ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/24/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Grande Communications Networks LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fonovisa, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roc-A-Fella Records, LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Music
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zomba Recording LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roadrunner Records, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhino Entertainment Company
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Records LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Records Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tooth & Nail, LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaFace Records LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Christian Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fueled by Ramen LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Records, LLC
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nonesuch Records Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Gilmore
Represented By: Philip J. O'Beirne
Represented By: Paige Arnette Amstutz
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Represented By: Pasquale A. Cipollone
Represented By: Jonathan E. Missner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Recording Industry Association of America
Represented By: Daniel C. Bitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grande Communication Networks LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Brophy
Represented By: Jennifer E. Hoekel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grande Communications Networks LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Brophy
Represented By: J. Stephen Ravel
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: John R. Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer E. Hoekel
Represented By: Diana L. Nichols
Represented By: Nicholas B. Clifford
Represented By: Margaret R. Szewczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?