Intel Corporation v. Rais

Plaintiff: Intel Corporation
Defendant: Shahil Rais
Case Number: 1:2019cv00020
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Intel Corporation. (Schottlaender, Hayden)
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Scheduling Order by Intel Corporation. (Painter, Ann)
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Shahil Rais. (Vlady, Elena)
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shahil Rais.(Vlady, Elena)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Rais's Motion for Leave to File Late Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Rais may file the answer attached to the Motion as Exhibit 1. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
February 15, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Late Answer by Shahil Rais. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Vlady, Elena)
February 11, 2019 Filing 26 Defendant's Original ANSWER to Complaint by Shahil Rais.(Vlady, Elena)
January 18, 2019 Filing 25 AGREED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2019 re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Intel Corporation. Written Order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(lt)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 16, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Painter, Ann)
January 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elena Vlady on behalf of Shahil Rais. Attorney Elena Vlady added to party Shahil Rais(pty:dft) (Vlady, Elena)
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intel Corporation. Shahil Rais served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Painter, Ann)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #18 Intel's Motion for Protective Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. A motion for a protective order "must include a certification that the movant has in good faith conferred or attempted to confer with other affected parties in an effort to resolve the dispute without court action." Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(1). Intel must include a certification that it conferred or attempted to confer with Rais regarding the proposed protective order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (DY)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Substitute Service of Process via Email. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Protective Order by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Painter, Ann)
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hayden M. Schottlaender on behalf of Intel Corporation. Attorney Hayden M. Schottlaender added to party Intel Corporation(pty:pla) (Schottlaender, Hayden)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BRADLEY HEANEY by Intel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Painter, Ann)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE OF PROCESS VIA EMAIL by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Painter, Ann)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RESETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING for January 18, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. CDT. TRO is MODIFIED to expire on January 24, 2019, at 5:00 p.m. CDT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jg3)
January 10, 2019 Motion Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/25/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #9 Application for Temporary Restraining Order. ORDER GRANTING Request for Expedited Discovery. ORDER setting preliminary injunction hearing for January 25, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. CDT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE CERTIFICATION OF INTELS ATTEMPTS TO SERVE AND NOTIFY DEFENDANT SHAHIL RAIS by Intel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Painter, Ann)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ADVISORY re #9 Application for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intel Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Expedited Discovery, and a Preliminary Injunction, by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order TRO, #2 Proposed Order Expedited Discovery)(lt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: #3 Appendix) (lt).
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits and DIRECTING clerk to file Intel's Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Expedited Discovery, and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Shahil Rais. (afd)
January 7, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Intel Corporation. (afd)
January 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ann Marie Painter [on behalf of Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke] ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11618030) by on behalf of Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Painter, Ann)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intel Corporation. (Painter, Ann)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 APPENDIX to #3 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 2-A, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 3-A, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 4-A)(Painter, Ann)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for TRO, Expedited Discovery & Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to Exceed Page Limitations, #3 Proposed Order Granting TRO, #4 Proposed Order Granting Expedited Discovery)(Painter, Ann)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Intel Corporation. (Painter, Ann) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/8/2019 to flatten image) (afd).
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11617600), filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Painter, Ann) (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/8/2019 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intel Corporation v. Rais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Ann Marie Painter
Represented By: Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke
Represented By: Jason R. Elliott
Represented By: Hayden M. Schottlaender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahil Rais
Represented By: Elena Vlady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?