Richie et al v. Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC and Shalewater Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00052
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Reed Oslan for Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kent Hayden for Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case and Brief in Support by Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Kent Hayden)(Dow, Matt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matt Dow for Reed Olsan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11775747) by on behalf of Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dow, Matt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matt Dow for Kent Hayden ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11775717) by on behalf of Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dow, Matt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matt Dow on behalf of Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. Attorney Matt Dow added to party Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (Dow, Matt)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC as to Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC. Waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Henderson, Timothy) Modified on 1/25/2019 to correct date waiver sent (td).
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Henderson, Timothy)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Henderson, Timothy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letter to David Loev. Sent via e-mail 1/22/2019. (afd)
January 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (afd)
January 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Henderson, Timothy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11669740). No Summons requested at this time, filed by James Chance Richie, ShaleApps, LLC, Shalewater Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henderson, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richie et al v. Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chance Richie
Represented By: Timothy J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ShaleApps, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalewater Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillstone Environmental Partners, LLC
Represented By: Reed Oslan
Represented By: Kent Hayden
Represented By: Matt Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?