Central Texas Metal Roofing Supply Co., Inc. v. Majestic Steel USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Central Texas Metal Roofing Supply Co., Inc.
Counter Plaintiff: Majestic Steel USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00053
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Central Texas Metal Roofing Supply Co., Inc.. (Voelker, Troy)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant filed by Central Texas Metal Roofing Supply Co., Inc..(Voelker, Troy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Original ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Central Texas Metal Roofing Supply Co., Inc. by Majestic Steel USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kabele, Heather)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, by Heather A. Kabele on behalf of Majestic Steel USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kabele, Heather)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Supplement to State Court Pleading (Docket Sheet) by Majestic Steel USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Kabele, Heather)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so.Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
January 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Majestic Steel USA, Inc.. (Kabele, Heather)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Majestic Steel USA, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11670720), filed by Majestic Steel USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kabele, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Texas Metal Roofing Supply Co., Inc. v. Majestic Steel USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Texas Metal Roofing Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By: Troy L. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Majestic Steel USA, Inc.
Represented By: Heather A. Kabele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?