Bentley v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Deborah Bentley
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00057
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Linda P. Wills added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Wills, Linda)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Bentley as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Roach, Lonnie)
January 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee Received $ 400. Receipt #0542-11680417). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Deborah Bentley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Roach, Lonnie) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 1/25/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentley v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Linda P. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bentley
Represented By: Lonnie Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?