Croix et al v. Provident Trust Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Alma Croix and Edmond Croix
Defendant: Provident Trust Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00102
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Petition filed by Provident Trust Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Rule 26(F) Joint Report Outlining Discovery Plan by Edmond Croix (Linkin, Robert)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Alma Croix, Edmond Croix. (Linkin, Robert) (Main Document 13 replaced on 4/3/2019 for correction) (so).
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Provident Trust Group, LLC, re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Petition filed by Defendant Provident Trust Group, LLC (Dodrill, Christopher)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher S. Dodrill on behalf of Provident Trust Group, LLC. Attorney Christopher S. Dodrill added to party Provident Trust Group, LLC(pty:dft) (Dodrill, Christopher)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alma Croix, Edmond Croix, re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Petition filed by Defendant Provident Trust Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Linkin, Robert)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Petition by Alma Croix, Edmond Croix. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linkin, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Petition by Provident Trust Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher Molnar, #2 Exhibit 2 - Provident Trust Individual Retirement Account, #3 Exhibit 3 - Provident Custodial Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Provident - Direction of Investment, #5 Proposed Order)(LaVigne, Christopher)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Provident Trust Group, LLC answer due 3/1/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Provident Trust Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaVigne, Christopher)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental State Court filings by Provident Trust Group, LLC. (LaVigne, Christopher)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
February 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alma Croix, Edmond Croix. (afd)
February 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Provident Trust Group, LLC Amended Certificate of Service #1 Notice of Removal, (LaVigne, Christopher)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Provident Trust Group, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11743739), filed by Provident Trust Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement B - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - Certificate of Interested Parties)(LaVigne, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croix et al v. Provident Trust Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Croix
Represented By: Christopher Camillone
Represented By: Robert Eric Linkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmond Croix
Represented By: Christopher Camillone
Represented By: Robert Eric Linkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Trust Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. LaVigne
Represented By: Christopher S. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?