Pensado v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Plaintiff: Juan Pensado
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America, life insurance company of North America Group Policy and Cigna Group Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00157
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Juan Pensado, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claim and Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against the "Life Insurance Company of North America Group Policy" filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America Group Policy, Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1)(Bourgeacq, Christian)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Subject to and Without Waiving its 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Life Insurance Company of North America, Life Insurance Company of North America Group Policy.(Wills, Linda)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claim and Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against the "Life Insurance Company of North America Group Policy" by Life Insurance Company of North America, Life Insurance Company of North America Group Policy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wills, Linda)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Nathan Prihoda. (td)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 4/8/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wills, Linda)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Pensado. Life Insurance Company of North America Group Policy served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Bourgeacq, Christian)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Pensado. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Bourgeacq, Christian)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America Group Policy. (td)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Juan Pensado. (Bourgeacq, Christian)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (afd)
February 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Juan Pensado. (Bourgeacq, Christian) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/20/2019 to flatten image) (afd).
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Juan Pensado. (Bourgeacq, Christian) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/21/2019 to flatten image) (afd).
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11776136), filed by Juan Pensado.(Bourgeacq, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pensado v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Elvia E. Hague
Represented By: Linda P. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: life insurance company of North America Group Policy
Represented By: Linda P. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance Company
Represented By: Elvia E. Hague
Represented By: Linda P. Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pensado
Represented By: Christian A. Bourgeacq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?