State of Texas v. ClubCorp Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Defendant: OK Vita Center Management Corp., OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation d/b/a Jefferson Club, Inc., OK Cipango Management Corporation, OK Akron Club Management Corp., ClubCorp Holdings, Inc., Brookhaven Country Club, Inc., The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc., The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc., d/b/a The Plaza, Tower Club, Inc., ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc. d/b/a Porter Valley Country Club, Inc., The Downtown Club, Inc. d/b/a The Plaza Club at Downtown, OK Atlanta City Club, Inc., Kingwood Country Club, Inc., OK Pre Owner Lafayette Club d/b/a Lafayette Club, Inc., University Club of Jackson, MISS d/b/a University Club of Jackson, Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc., OK Pre Operator of Halifax Club, Inc. d/b/a Halifax Club, Inc. or Halifax Investment Club, OK Century II Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation d/b/a The Relay House, Hill Country Golf, Inc. d/b/a Lost Creek Country Club, OK Heritage Club, Inc., Richardson Country Club Corp. d/b/a Canyon Creek Country Club, Citrus Club, Inc. d/b/a Citrus Club or Citrus Athletic Club, OK Atrium Club, Inc., Walnut Creek Management Corp., OK University Club of Houston, Inc., OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc., The Downtown Club, Inc., Hill Country Golf, Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation, Citrus Club, Inc., University Club of Jackson, MISS, Richardson Country Club Corp., OK Pre Operator of Halifax Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation and The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00171
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by State of Texas, re #17 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff State of Texas (Jackson, Jennifer)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #17 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State of Texas. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (afd)
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Brookhaven Country Club, Inc., Citrus Club, Inc., Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc., ClubCorp Holdings, Inc., ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc., Hill Country Golf, Inc., Kingwood Country Club, Inc., OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc., OK Akron Club Management Corp., OK Atlanta City Club, Inc., OK Atrium Club, Inc., OK Century II Club, Inc., OK Cipango Management Corporation, OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc., OK Heritage Club, Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation, OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club, OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation, OK University Club of Houston, Inc., OK Vita Center Management Corp., Richardson Country Club Corp., The Downtown Club, Inc., The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc., The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc., Tower Club, Inc., University Club of Jackson, MISS, Walnut Creek Management Corp., re #17 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff State of Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wooten, Kennon)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 27, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and Dealine to Respond by Brookhaven Country Club, Inc., Citrus Club, Inc., Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc., ClubCorp Holdings, Inc., ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc., Hill Country Golf, Inc., Kingwood Country Club, Inc., OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc., OK Akron Club Management Corp., OK Atlanta City Club, Inc., OK Atrium Club, Inc., OK Century II Club, Inc., OK Cipango Management Corporation, OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc., OK Heritage Club, Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation, OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club, OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation, OK University Club of Houston, Inc., OK Vita Center Management Corp., Richardson Country Club Corp., The Downtown Club, Inc., The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc., The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc., Tower Club, Inc., University Club of Jackson, MISS, Walnut Creek Management Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wooten, Kennon)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Jennifer)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Motion to Remand by State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Jennifer)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Settle Jackson on behalf of State of Texas. Attorney Jennifer Settle Jackson added to party State of Texas(pty:pla) (Jackson, Jennifer)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael P. Kenny for Brookhaven Country Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for Citrus Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for ClubCorp Holdings, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for Hill Country Golf, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for Kingwood Country Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for OK Akron Club Management Corp.,Michael P. Kenny for OK Atlanta City Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for OK Atrium Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for OK Century II Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for OK Cipango Management Corporation,Michael P. Kenny for OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for OK Heritage Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation,Michael P. Kenny for OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club,Michael P. Kenny for OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for OK The Relay House Corporation,Michael P. Kenny for OK University Club of Houston, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for OK Vita Center Management Corp.,Michael P. Kenny for Richardson Country Club Corp.,Michael P. Kenny for The Downtown Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for Tower Club, Inc.,Michael P. Kenny for University Club of Jackson, MISS,Michael P. Kenny for Walnut Creek Management Corp.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan D. Parente for Brookhaven Country Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for Citrus Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for ClubCorp Holdings, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for Hill Country Golf, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for Kingwood Country Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Akron Club Management Corp.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Atlanta City Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Atrium Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Century II Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Cipango Management Corporation,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Heritage Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK The Relay House Corporation,Jonathan D. Parente for OK University Club of Houston, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for OK Vita Center Management Corp.,Jonathan D. Parente for Richardson Country Club Corp.,Jonathan D. Parente for The Downtown Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for Tower Club, Inc.,Jonathan D. Parente for University Club of Jackson, MISS,Jonathan D. Parente for Walnut Creek Management Corp.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ethan D. Millar for Brookhaven Country Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for Citrus Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for ClubCorp Holdings, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for Hill Country Golf, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for Kingwood Country Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for OK Akron Club Management Corp.,Ethan D. Millar for OK Atlanta City Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for OK Atrium Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for OK Century II Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for OK Cipango Management Corporation,Ethan D. Millar for OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for OK Heritage Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation,Ethan D. Millar for OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club,Ethan D. Millar for OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for OK The Relay House Corporation,Ethan D. Millar for OK University Club of Houston, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for OK Vita Center Management Corp.,Ethan D. Millar for Richardson Country Club Corp.,Ethan D. Millar for The Downtown Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for Tower Club, Inc.,Ethan D. Millar for University Club of Jackson, MISS,Ethan D. Millar for Walnut Creek Management Corp.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Brookhaven Country Club, Inc., Citrus Club, Inc., Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc., ClubCorp Holdings, Inc., ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc., Hill Country Golf, Inc., Kingwood Country Club, Inc., OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc., OK Akron Club Management Corp., OK Atlanta City Club, Inc., OK Atrium Club, Inc., OK Century II Club, Inc., OK Cipango Management Corporation, OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc., OK Heritage Club, Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation, OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club, OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation, OK University Club of Houston, Inc., OK Vita Center Management Corp., Richardson Country Club Corp., The Downtown Club, Inc., The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc., The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc., Tower Club, Inc., University Club of Jackson, MISS, Walnut Creek Management Corp..(Wooten, Kennon)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brittany Baxter Long for State of Texas. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua A. Eames-Cepero for State of Texas. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kennon L. Wooten ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11823508) by Ethan D. Millar on behalf of Brookhaven Country Club, Inc., Citrus Club, Inc., Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc., ClubCorp Holdings, Inc., ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc., Hill Country Golf, Inc., Kingwood Country Club, Inc., OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc., OK Akron Club Management Corp., OK Atlanta City Club, Inc., OK Atrium Club, Inc., OK Century II Club, Inc., OK Cipango Management Corporation, OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc., OK Heritage Club, Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation, OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club, OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation, OK University Club of Houston, Inc., OK Vita Center Management Corp., Richardson Country Club Corp., The Downtown Club, Inc., The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc., The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc., Tower Club, Inc., University Club of Jackson, MISS, Walnut Creek Management Corp.. (Wooten, Kennon) Modified on 2/28/2019 (dm).
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kennon L. Wooten ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11823478) by Michael P. Kenny on behalf of Brookhaven Country Club, Inc., Citrus Club, Inc., Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc., ClubCorp Holdings, Inc., ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc., Hill Country Golf, Inc., Kingwood Country Club, Inc., OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc., OK Akron Club Management Corp., OK Atlanta City Club, Inc., OK Atrium Club, Inc., OK Century II Club, Inc., OK Cipango Management Corporation, OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc., OK Heritage Club, Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation, OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club, OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation, OK University Club of Houston, Inc., OK Vita Center Management Corp., Richardson Country Club Corp., The Downtown Club, Inc., The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc., The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc., Tower Club, Inc., University Club of Jackson, MISS, Walnut Creek Management Corp.. (Wooten, Kennon) Modified on 2/28/2019 (dm).
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kennon L. Wooten ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11823260) by Jonathan D. Parente on behalf of Brookhaven Country Club, Inc., Citrus Club, Inc., Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc., ClubCorp Holdings, Inc., ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc., Hill Country Golf, Inc., Kingwood Country Club, Inc., OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc., OK Akron Club Management Corp., OK Atlanta City Club, Inc., OK Atrium Club, Inc., OK Century II Club, Inc., OK Cipango Management Corporation, OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc., OK Heritage Club, Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation, OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club, OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation, OK University Club of Houston, Inc., OK Vita Center Management Corp., Richardson Country Club Corp., The Downtown Club, Inc., The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc., The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc., Tower Club, Inc., University Club of Jackson, MISS, Walnut Creek Management Corp.. (Wooten, Kennon) Modified on 2/28/2019 (dm).
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ann Hartley for Brittany Long by on behalf of State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice-Long)(Hartley, Ann)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ann Hartley for Joshua Eames-Cepero by on behalf of State of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice-Eames-Cepero)(Hartley, Ann)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letters to Brittany Long and Joshua Eames-Cepero. (afd)
February 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation, OK University Club of Houston, Inc., OK Atrium Club, Inc., OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc., Brookhaven Country Club, Inc., ClubCorp Holdings, Inc., OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club, Citrus Club, Inc., Kingwood Country Club, Inc., OK Atlanta City Club, Inc., OK Heritage Club, Inc., Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc., Richardson Country Club Corp., OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation, OK Vita Center Management Corp., OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc., OK Cipango Management Corporation, OK Century II Club, Inc., OK Akron Club Management Corp., Hill Country Golf, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11794823), filed by ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc., OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation, OK University Club of Houston, Inc., OK Atrium Club, Inc., OK Pre 12-30-98 Operator of Halifax Club, Inc., Brookhaven Country Club, Inc., ClubCorp Holdings, Inc., OK Pre 12-23-99 Owner Lafayette Club, Citrus Club, Inc., Kingwood Country Club, Inc., OK Atlanta City Club, Inc., OK Heritage Club, Inc., Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc., Richardson Country Club Corp., OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc., OK The Relay House Corporation, OK Vita Center Management Corp., OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc., OK Cipango Management Corporation, OK Century II Club, Inc., OK Akron Club Management Corp., Hill Country Golf, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wooten, Kennon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Texas v. ClubCorp Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Vita Center Management Corp.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK 2001 Bryan Tower Club Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation d/b/a Jefferson Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Cipango Management Corporation
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Akron Club Management Corp.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClubCorp Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookhaven Country Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Plaza Club of San Antonio, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc., d/b/a The Plaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Club, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClubCorp Porter Valley Country Club, Inc. d/b/a Porter Valley Country Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Downtown Club, Inc. d/b/a The Plaza Club at Downtown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Atlanta City Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingwood Country Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Pre Owner Lafayette Club d/b/a Lafayette Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Club of Jackson, MISS d/b/a University Club of Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Club Corp Braemar Country Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Pre Operator of Halifax Club, Inc. d/b/a Halifax Club, Inc. or Halifax Investment Club
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Century II Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK The Relay House Corporation d/b/a The Relay House
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Country Golf, Inc. d/b/a Lost Creek Country Club
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Heritage Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardson Country Club Corp. d/b/a Canyon Creek Country Club
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrus Club, Inc. d/b/a Citrus Club or Citrus Athletic Club
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Atrium Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walnut Creek Management Corp.
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK University Club of Houston, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Forest Oak Country Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Downtown Club, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Country Golf, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Jefferson Club Management Corporation
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrus Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Club of Jackson, MISS
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardson Country Club Corp.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK Pre Operator of Halifax Club, Inc.
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OK The Relay House Corporation
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Metropolitan Club of Chicago, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph H. Duggins, III
Represented By: Jonathan D. Parente
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Kennon L. Wooten
Represented By: Ethan D. Millar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Represented By: Brittany Baxter Long
Represented By: Joshua A. Eames-Cepero
Represented By: Ann Hartley
Represented By: Jennifer Settle Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?