Yannacone v. Merchants and Professional Bureau, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gerald Yannacone
Defendant: Merchants and Professional Bureau, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00193
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Merchants and Professional Bureau, Inc..(Sander, David)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING #4 Motion for More Definite Statement Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Merchants and Professional Bureau, Inc. amending #1 Complaint., filed by Gerald Yannacone.(Mazaheri, Bernard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Merchants and Professional Bureau, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sander, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Merchants and Professional Bureau, Inc.. (cj)
March 1, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gerald Yannacone. (cj)
March 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gerald Yannacone. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11827946), filed by Gerald Yannacone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mazaheri, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yannacone v. Merchants and Professional Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Yannacone
Represented By: Bernard R. Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants and Professional Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Sander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?