DHK Storage, LLC v. Buffalo Americas, Inc.

Plaintiff: DHK Storage, LLC
Defendant: Buffalo Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00196
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion by Armon Bryan Shahdadi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion by Benjamin D. Bailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion by Brannon Charles McKay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manoj S. Gandhi for Brannon McKay ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11881113) by on behalf of DHK Storage, LLC. (Gandhi, Manoj)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manoj S. Gandhi for Benjamin Bailey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11881099) by on behalf of DHK Storage, LLC. (Gandhi, Manoj)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Manoj S. Gandhi for Armon Shahdadi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11881055) by on behalf of DHK Storage, LLC. (Gandhi, Manoj)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Benjamin D. Bailey, Brannon C. McKay, and Armon B. Shahdadi for Plaintiff DHK Storage, LLC re: non-admitted status. (cj)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj)
March 1, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DHK Storage, LLC. (cj)
March 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for patent infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11828962). No Summons requested at this time, filed by DHK Storage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1:19-cv-00196 cover sheet)(Gandhi, Manoj) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 3/5/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DHK Storage, LLC v. Buffalo Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DHK Storage, LLC
Represented By: Manoj S. Gandhi
Represented By: Brannon Charles McKay
Represented By: Benjamin Douglas Bailey
Represented By: Armon Bryan Shahdadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?