DFW Aviation, LLC v. Mansfield Heliflight, Inc.
Plaintiff: DFW Aviation, LLC
Defendant: Mansfield Heliflight, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00481
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by DFW Aviation, LLC, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Mansfield Heliflight, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josh Abelson)(Chiarello, Katherine)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Deadline for Plaintiff to File Its Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by DFW Aviation, LLC. (Chiarello, Katherine)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mansfield Heliflight, Inc.. (Robison, Christopher)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 APPENDIX to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Mansfield Heliflight, Inc.. (Robison, Christopher)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3), Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Mansfield Heliflight, Inc.. (Robison, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DFW Aviation, LLC. Mansfield Heliflight, Inc. served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Chiarello, Katherine)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mansfield Heliflight, Inc.. (cj)
May 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DFW Aviation, LLC f/k/a Red Aviation, LLC. (Chiarello, Katherine)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DFW Aviation, LLC f/k/a Red Aviation, LLC. (Chiarello, Katherine)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12074883), filed by DFW Aviation, LLC f/k/a Red Aviation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chiarello, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DFW Aviation, LLC v. Mansfield Heliflight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mansfield Heliflight, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Robison
Represented By: John G. Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DFW Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?