Tormos v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jasmine Tormos
Defendant: Dave Romo and Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00505
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jasmine Tormos, re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Dave Romo (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Usoro, Okon)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Jasmine Tormos.(Usoro, Okon)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dave Romo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Marin, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Watson, Timothy)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation's Certificate of Interested Persons by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Watson, Timothy)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint. Attorney Timothy M. Watson added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft) by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Watson, Timothy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Costco Wholesale Corporation, Dave Romo. (dm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jasmine Tormos. (Usoro, Okon)
May 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jasmine Tormos. (cj)
May 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12097972), filed by Jasmine Tormos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Usoro, Okon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tormos v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Tormos
Represented By: Okon J. Usoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Romo
Represented By: Michael Dennis Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Timothy M. Watson
Represented By: Christal A. Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?