Grassroots Leadership v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Plaintiff: Grassroots Leadership
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00530
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Grassroots Leadership (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Watson, Susan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Liane Ngin Noble-AUSA added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft) by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Noble-AUSA, Liane)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(lt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Watson, Susan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/21/2019 to flatten form) (lt).
May 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12121835). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Grassroots Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Susan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/17/2019 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grassroots Leadership v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Liane Ngin Noble-AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grassroots Leadership
Represented By: Susan L. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?