DOE v. Eanes Independent School District
Plaintiff: JANE EANESISD-VK DOE
Defendant: Eanes Independent School District
Case Number: 1:2019cv00538
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions #4 #6 , due on or before July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 Opposed MOTION To Require Plaintiff to Proceed in Her Real Name by JANE EANESISD-VK DOE. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document)(Gorman, Terry)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION To Require Plaintiff to Proceed in Her Real Name by Eanes Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lamp, Paul)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by Eanes Independent School District. (Courtin, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Eanes Independent School District. (Lamp, Paul)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eanes Independent School District. (dl)
May 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JANE EANESISD-VK DOE. (dl)
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by JANE EANESISD-VK DOE. (Gorman, Terry)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ORIGINAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12133623), filed by JANE EANESISD-VK DOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gorman, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. Eanes Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE EANESISD-VK DOE
Represented By: Terry P. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eanes Independent School District
Represented By: Adam D. Courtin
Represented By: Paul A. Lamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?