Hogan v. Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC

Plaintiff: Bill Hogan
Defendant: Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00547
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and alternatively FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1)(York, Andrew)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #4 Motion to Dismiss and Alternatively for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Original Complaint against Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC amending, filed by Bill Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hillin, Hunter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bill Hogan. Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC served on 5/27/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Hillin, Hunter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and alternatively for More Definite Statement by Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(York, Andrew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC. (cj)
May 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bill Hogan. (cj)
May 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Bill Hogan as to Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC. (Hillin, Hunter) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 5/23/2019) (cj).
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12149418), filed by Bill Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hillin, Hunter) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 5/23/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Hogan
Represented By: Hunter Thomas Hillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmany Golf & Travel, LLC
Represented By: Andrew F. York
Represented By: Mark Lee Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?