Allstate Insurance Company v. Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00598
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC answer due 8/22/2019. (td)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and includes August 22, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
July 17, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respon to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief)(Powers, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC answer due 7/23/2019. (td)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and includes July 23, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powers, Matthew)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Luc Dahlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for I. Neel Chatterjee o Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED ORDER on Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company Regarding #20 Agreed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Joint) (Phillips, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John Patrick Phillips: re #20 Agreed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Joint). (td)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Joint) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Request for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Motion for Reciprocal Expedited Discovery by Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC. (Powers, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. Kennedy for L. Neel Chatterjee ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12235970) by on behalf of Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC. (Kennedy, Peter)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. Kennedy for Luc Dahlin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12235909) by on behalf of Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC. (Kennedy, Peter)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company #14 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, John)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Katelyn R. Miller. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
June 12, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/25/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 **MODIFIED as Per Order #23 ** ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #4 Motion for Discovery; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #3 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) Modified on 6/20/2019 (lt).
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Patrick Phillips for Katelyn R. Miller ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12220529) by on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Phillips, John)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erik W. Weibust. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Scott Humphrey. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Katelyn R. Miller regarding non-admitted status. (dl)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC. (dl)
June 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Insurance Company. (dl)
June 10, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Patrick Phillips for Erik W. Weibust ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12212242) by on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Courts of Admittance, #2 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Patrick Phillips for J. Scott Humphrey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12212226) by on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery and to Preserve Evidence by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and to Preserve Evidence, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, #3 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Phillips, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Allstate Insurance Company. (Phillips, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/11/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12211267), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanopy Insurance Center, LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. Powers
Represented By: I. Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Luc Dahlin
Represented By: Peter D. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: John Patrick Phillips
Represented By: J. Scott Humphrey
Represented By: Erik W. Weibust
Represented By: Katelyn R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?