Ensor v. John Does 1-15
Plaintiff: Elyse Ensor
Defendant: John Does 1-15
Case Number: 1:2019cv00625
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred to Judge Andrew Austin: #2 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Non-Party Discovery Prop to the Appearance of Any Defendant and Memorandum of Fact and Law in Support Thereof (dm)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Non-Party Discovery Prop to the Appearance of Any Defendant and Memorandum of Fact and Law in Support Thereof filed by Elyse Ensor. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (dm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Samuel A. Mullman (Mullman, Samuel)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul F. Wellborn III. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kelly O. Wallace. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Samuel A. Mullman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Isabelle Maria Antongiorgi Paul F. Wellborn, III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12262275) by on behalf of Elyse Ensor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Antongiorgi, Isabelle)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Isabelle Maria Antongiorgi Kelly O. Wallace ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12262257) by on behalf of Elyse Ensor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Antongiorgi, Isabelle)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Isabelle Maria Antongiorgi Samuel A. Mullman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12262142) by on behalf of Elyse Ensor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Antongiorgi, Isabelle)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #13***ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Non-Party Discovery Prop to the Appearance of Any Defendant and Memorandum of Fact and Law in Support Thereof filed by Elyse Ensor. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dm) Modified on 7/18/2019 (dm).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Samuel A. Mullman, Kelly O. Wallace, and Paul F. Wellborn, III for Plaintiff Elyse Ensor re: non-admitted status. (cj)
June 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Elyse Ensor. (cj)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Non-Party Discovery Prop to the Appearance of Any Defendant and Memorandum of Fact and Law in Support Thereof by Elyse Ensor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Antongiorgi, Isabelle)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12240712). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Elyse Ensor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.1, #2 Exhibit A.2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Antongiorgi, Isabelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ensor v. John Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elyse Ensor
Represented By: Isabelle Maria Antongiorgi
Represented By: David E. Dunham
Represented By: Samuel A. Mullman
Represented By: Paul F. Wellborn, III
Represented By: Kelly O. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?