Wu v. Modesens Inc.
Plaintiff: Carl Wu
Defendant: Modesens Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00646
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Modesens Inc. answer due 9/11/2019. (dm)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 11, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Modesens Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ku, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Modesens Inc. answer due 8/21/2019. (dm)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before August 21, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Modesens Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ku, Michelle)
July 9, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Modesens Inc. answer due 7/31/2019. (dm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before July 31, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Modesens Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ku, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Wu. Modesens Inc. served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Modesens Inc. (dl) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/25/2019 with corrected image) (dl).
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
June 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carl Wu. (dl)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Carl Wu. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/25/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12270681). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Carl Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/25/2019 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Modesens Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modesens Inc.
Represented By: Terrell Richard Miller
Represented By: Michelle Y. Ku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Wu
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?